Signal Technology, Inc. v. PennSummit Tubular, LLC
Plaintiff: Signal Technology, Inc.
Defendant: PennSummit Tubular, LLC
Case Number: 0:2009cv60636
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Defendant's Combined Renewed Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for Remittitur. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/1/2010. (egr)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/3/2010. (egr)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 83 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Take One Deposition After the Deadline to Complete Fact Discovery. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/17/2010. (egr)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Parallel State Court Actions. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/9/2010. (egr)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's 6 Motion for Stay of Discovery is denied as moot. The Court shall enter a separate Order resetting the trial date and revising the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 10/16/2009. (egr)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 32 Plaintiff Leave to File Sur-Reply. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/21/2009. (egr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signal Technology, Inc. v. PennSummit Tubular, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signal Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph William Lawrence, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennSummit Tubular, LLC
Represented By: Michael Darren Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?