Certex USA, Inc. v. Vidal
Plaintiff: Certex USA, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Vidal
Case Number: 0:2009cv61818
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: K. Michael Moore
Presiding Judge: Andrea M. Simonton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying, without prejudice to renew, Plaintiff's request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, contained in 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Within 45 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may refile a motion for attorney's fees and costs. Any refiled motion shall comply with Local Rule 7.3(a) & (b). Any refiled motion shall also contain unredacted billing records, which will enable the Court and Defendant to evaluate the reasonableness of the clai med fees, and shall state why Plaintiff is entitled to attorney's fees and costs related to: 1) a state court case and 2) the more than six months prior to the filing of the Complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 12/27/2010. (dlt)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 43 Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure Required by Rule 26(a); granting in part and denying in part 44 Defendant Vidal's Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Request to Produce of 2/3/09, as stated in the body of the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 4/15/2010. (dlt)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING 26 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/8/2010. (rg1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certex USA, Inc. v. Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certex USA, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Scott Purdie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?