Siegmund v. Bian et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Siegmund
Defendant: Xuelian Bian, Wei Guan, Song Qiang Chen, Ling Li, MetaMining, Inc., Metamining Nevada, Inc., CD International Enterprises, Inc., China Direct Investments, Inc., Capital One Resource Co., Ltd. and Linkwell Corporation
Case Number: 0:2012cv62539
Filed: December 26, 2012
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: William J. Zloch
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2016 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 371 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 373 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot 388 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 378 Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 6/8/2016. (zvr)
April 11, 2016 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 325 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing; denying 332 Motion to Strike; vacating 323 Endorsed Order; dismissing without prejudice 187 Third Amended Shareholders Derivative Complaint as to all Defendants. All other pending mo tions denied as moot. Closing Case. Other Motions Terminated: 258 Report and Recommendations; 344 Plaintiff's MOTION for Contempt Against Song Qiang Chen, Ling Li, Metamining, Inc. and Metamining Nevada Inc. with Incorporated Memora ndum of Law filed by Frederick Siegmund; 356 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge 354 Order to District Court Denying Defendants' Second Amended Motion to Quash Portions of Non-Party Subpoena Served on Sidley Austin LLP. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/11/2016. (zvr) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
April 6, 2016 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining 277 Objections to Order of Magistrate Judge; reversing 265 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/6/2016. (zvr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegmund v. Bian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Siegmund
Represented By: Lisa K. Bennett
Represented By: Malcolm T. Brown
Represented By: Charles J. Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xuelian Bian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Guan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Qiang Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ling Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetaMining, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metamining Nevada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD International Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Direct Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Resource Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkwell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?