United States of America v. One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA and $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 0:2013cv60741
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
0 Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
1 Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Airline Regs.
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2013 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #29 Order of Forfeiture and Dismissal with Prejudice. (jua)
October 16, 2013 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed. (tpl)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF FORFEITURE AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/18/2013. (jua)
September 18, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION and settlement agreement by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckerleg, William)
August 21, 2013 Filing 27 Clerks Notice to Filer re #25 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Claim. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#26]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jua)
August 20, 2013 Filing 26 CLAIMANTS AMENDED CLAIM by $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank, One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. (See DE #25 for image) (jua)
August 20, 2013 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Claim by $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank. Responses due by 9/6/2013 (Gershman, Robert)
July 10, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Scott Gershman on behalf of $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank. Attorney Robert Scott Gershman added to party $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank(pty:dft). (Gershman, Robert)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/20/2013. (jua)
June 20, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckerleg, William)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 GENERAL ORDER on Discovery Objections and Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/12/2013. (jua)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Trial Date and Discovery Deadlines: ( Trial set for 5/19/2014 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 5/16/2014 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2013., Discovery due by 1/20/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2013., In Limine Motions due by 4/30/2014., Substantive Pretrial Motions due by 2/19/2014., Mandatory Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/30/2014.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/12/2013. (See order for further deadlines and details) (jua)
June 11, 2013 Filing 19 AMENDED JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT - Rule 26(f) by United States of America (Beckerleg, William) Modified text on 6/12/2013 (jua).
June 10, 2013 Filing 18 JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT - Rule 26(f) by United States of America (Beckerleg, William) Modified text on 6/11/2013 (jua).
June 5, 2013 Filing 17 CLAIM Verified Claim-corrected by $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank, One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. (Balaguera, Brian)
May 30, 2013 Filing 16 CLAIM Verified by $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank, One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Balaguera, Brian)
May 30, 2013 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank, One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. (Balaguera, Brian)
May 24, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Balaguera on behalf of $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank, One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA (Balaguera, Brian)
May 3, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per Order #13 : $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank response due 5/31/2013; One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA response due 5/31/2013. (mg) Modified on 5/3/2013 (jmd).
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Omnibus ORDER granting 11 Sealed Motion; granting 12 Sealed Motion Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/2/2013. (mg)
May 2, 2013 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 12 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mb)
May 2, 2013 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 11 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mb)
April 30, 2013 Filing 10 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to $403,604.82 in US Dollars from HP Brothers, LLC Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank. (tpl)
April 22, 2013 Filing 9 Amended Warrant In Rem Issued as to $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/22/2013. (asl)
April 19, 2013 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Warrant)(Beckerleg, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/22/2013) (asl). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/22/2013) (asl).
April 11, 2013 Filing 7 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. (ar2)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring counsel to meet and file Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/3/2013. (lk)
April 1, 2013 Filing 5 Warrant In Rem Issued as to One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/1/2013. (ail)
April 1, 2013 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ail)
April 1, 2013 Filing 3 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet by United States Attorney (ail)
April 1, 2013 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (ail)
April 1, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA. Filing fee $ 350.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 JS 44, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Warrant)(Beckerleg, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 1978 Israel 1124 Fixed-Wing Jet, Serial No. 223, FAA Reg# N518WA
Represented By: Brian Balaguera
Represented By: Robert Scott Gershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $403,604.82 in U.S. Dollars Seized from HP Brothers, LLC. Account #2000021349298 at Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Brian Balaguera
Represented By: Robert Scott Gershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William H. Beckerleg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?