Ali v. District Director, Miami District, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: |
Ghiass Mouhamed Ali |
Defendant: |
District Director, Miami District, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, Oakland Park Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Attorney General of the United States, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Secretary of State, Acting Asst. Secretary for Consular Affairs, U.S. Dept. of State, Deputy Asst. Secretary for Visa Services, U.S. Dept. of State and Director, Central Intelligence Agency |
Case Number: |
0:2015cv61820 |
Filed: |
August 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Florida |
Office: |
Ft Lauderdale Office |
County: |
Broward |
Presiding Judge: |
Beth Bloom |
Nature of Suit: |
Naturalization Application |
Cause of Action: |
08 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTdenying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 42 Joint Motion to Remove this Matter from the Trial Calendar. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/14/2016. (tas)
|
December 14, 2015 |
Filing
12
ORDER granting 9 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/11/2015. (ar2)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Ali v. District Director, Miami District, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: District Director, Miami District, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Field Office Director, Oakland Park Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Secretary of Homeland Security |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: U.S. Secretary of State |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Acting Asst. Secretary for Consular Affairs, U.S. Dept. of State |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deputy Asst. Secretary for Visa Services, U.S. Dept. of State |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Director, Central Intelligence Agency |
Represented By: |
Noticing INS Attorney |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Ghiass Mouhamed Ali |
Represented By: |
Anis Nouhad Saleh |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?