WILDING et al v. DNC SERVICES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: WILDING, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, DAVID L MEULI, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, BARBARA BOWEN, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, CARL MILLER, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, CARLOS VILLAMAR, ELESHA SNYDER, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, DOMINIC RONZANI, LUKE GRIM, HEATHER JORDAN, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, ZEKE SHAW, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, TUKOI JARRETT, MELISSA LIANG, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ANDREW ORRINO, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, TERI MONACO, ALETTE PRICHETT, DIANE ROBINSON, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, JOSEPH GLEASON, MARK BEDARD, LISA SETTLE, GEORGE THOMAS, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, VINCENT J CAUCHI, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, GRETA MICKEY, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, MARY JASMINE WELCH, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, SUSAN L SINGER, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, LUCILLE GROOMS, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, ANTHONY GRUDIN, SEAN LYNCH, MICHAEL S REED, DANIEL O'MEARA, JEN BETTERLEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, KIM MARIE HOULE, D.J. BUSCHINI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, ERIKA SITZER, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, ELIZA FEERO, JARATH HEMPHILL, HEATHER DADE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, RANA KANGAS-KENT, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, KARLIE COLE, TWANA SPARKS, ALECIA R DAVIS, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, DAVID PULASKI, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, WILLIAM CRANDALL, CAROLYN JACOBSON, ANNMARIE WILSON, BRANDY KINCAID, AMALIE DUVALL, RICHARD BOYLAN, PEGGY LEW, JULIE HAMPTON, SUSAN ROPPEL, SUSAN FRISBIE, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, EMMA L YOUNG, RYAN GHAN, LAURA GENNA, JAMES SIMON, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, TRISTAN BURGENER, STEVE PHILIPP, BRETT TEEGARDIN, AUSTIN DREIS-ORNELAS, RICK WASHIK, SHARON JANIS, ERIK FURREBOE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, BRITTANY R MUSICK, SHERRY DAVIS, TIMOTHY BINGEN, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, JOHN LYNCH, ANGELA MONSON, DIANA FLORES, KENNETH E PUCKETT, JEFF ROGERS, JOHN CROWE, BRUCE BUSTO, DAVID N PYLES, MATTHEW SHAW, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, CATHERINE G CYKO, KIRSTEN HURST, CONNIE ANDERSON, RACHEL RODERICK, SHARON CRAWFORD, MELISSA MARCOTTE, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, CATHERINE WILLOTT, YALONDA DYE COOPER, BAKH INAMOV, KYLE G BRAUND, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, EDWIN LUGO, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, LISA GALE, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, JOSEPH CALLAN, ERICH SPARKS, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ALAINA TALBOY, REBECCA HOHM, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, AIMEE R COLEMAN, CAROL WILDING, MARIANNE BLAIR, LAUREN HALE, KATHLEEN L DODGE, SUSAN CATTERALL, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, KATHRYN BAILEY CONANT, DANIEL S COOPER, SARAH LOPEZ, HARRIS BIERHOFF, SUSAN PHILLIPS, STANLEY RIFKEN, CHRIS BUBB, LISA ANNE MENEELY, SUSAN REED, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, TIMO A JOHANN, RICHARD BOOKER and TORSHA CHILDS
Defendant: DNC SERVICES CORPORATION and DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ
Intervenor: Steve Schonberg
Case Number: 0:2016cv61511
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: William J Zloch
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ruthzee Louijeune withdrawn from case Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Ruthzee Louijeune.. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Zloch on 2/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ruthzee Louijeune for / by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Thomas, Gregg)
February 21, 2018 Filing 71 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #63 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 17-14194-HH. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (apz)
January 17, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG NOTICE OF FILING OF JANUARY 10, 2018 ORDER FROM THE U.S. 11TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS AND OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 10, 2018 Order from the U.S. 11th Circuit Court of Appeals, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint) (O'Brien, Cullin)
October 13, 2017 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 9/26/17 by Elizabeth Beck, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 954-769-5488 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov re #67 Court Reporter Acknowledgment, #65 Transcript Information Form,,,,,,,,,, #63 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,. (tnr)
October 13, 2017 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 8/23/16 before Senior Judge William J. Zloch, 1-76 pages, re: #63 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 954-769-5488 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. USCA Case Number: 17-14194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2018. (tnr)
October 2, 2017 Filing 67 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re #65 Transcript Information Form,,,,,,,,,, #63 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 954-769-5488 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (tnr)
September 27, 2017 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - has been filed on 4-28-17, Docket Entry 54, by Francine Salopek re #65 Transcript Information Form. (fs)
September 22, 2017 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG re #63 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,. hearing transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by Elizabeth Lee Beck. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Beck, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2017 Filing 64 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #63 Notice of Appeal filed by HEATHER JORDAN, ZEKE SHAW, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, LUCILLE GROOMS, CARLOS VILLAMAR, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DAVID N PYLES, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CAROLYN JACOBSON, LUKE GRIM, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, BARBARA BOWEN, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, AMALIE DUVALL, CAROL WILDING, TORSHA CHILDS, LISA GALE, CHRIS BUBB, DOMINIC RONZANI, ANGELA MONSON, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, BRUCE BUSTO, JULIE HAMPTON, ANNMARIE WILSON, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, RACHEL RODERICK, KARLIE COLE, STEVE PHILIPP, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, RICHARD BOYLAN, DIANA FLORES, JEFF ROGERS, SUSAN PHILLIPS, LAURA GENNA, CONNIE ANDERSON, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, RHIANNON CRANDALL, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, ELESHA SNYDER, D.J. BUSCHINI, JOSEPH CALLAN, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TRISTAN BURGENER, BRANDY KINCAID, EMMA L YOUNG, BRITTANY R MUSICK, SUSAN CATTERALL, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, MICHAEL S REED, ERIK FURREBOE, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, MELISSA MARCOTTE, VINCENT J CAUCHI, ANTHONY GRUDIN, DIANE ROBINSON, SUSAN L SINGER, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, BRETT TEEGARDIN, MELISSA LIANG, SUSAN REED, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, DAVID PULASKI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, CATHERINE WILLOTT, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, PEGGY LEW, AIMEE R COLEMAN, LISA SETTLE, DAVID L MEULI, REBECCA HOHM, ALETTE PRICHETT, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, TUKOI JARRETT, KIRSTEN HURST, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, RANA KANGAS-KENT, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, KIM MARIE HOULE, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, STANLEY RIFKEN, EDWIN LUGO, WILLIAM CRANDALL, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL O'MEARA, SHERRY DAVIS, HEATHER DADE, SUSAN ROPPEL, BAKH INAMOV, JAMES SIMON, MARK BEDARD, JOSEPH GLEASON, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, MARIANNE BLAIR, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, ALECIA R DAVIS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, JARATH HEMPHILL, JOHN CROWE, JOHN LYNCH, RICK WASHIK, SEAN LYNCH, RICHARD BOOKER, SUZANNE M CORK, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, TIMOTHY BINGEN, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, LAUREN HALE, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, GEORGE THOMAS, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, TERI MONACO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, ELIZA FEERO, BRENDA LEE SMITH, MATTHEW SHAW, SUSAN FRISBIE, ANDREW ORRINO, CATHERINE G CYKO, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, ERIKA SITZER, SHARON CRAWFORD, GAYLE ANN HARROD, TIMO A JOHANN, JEN BETTERLEY, SARAH LOPEZ, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, KYLE G BRAUND, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, RYAN GHAN. Date received by USCA: 9/19/2017. USCA Case Number: 17-14194-A. (apz)
September 18, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal. Order Under Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #63 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (amb)
September 8, 2017 Filing 63 Notice of Appeal as to #62 Order Dismissing Case, by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-10029718. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Beck, Elizabeth)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Final Order of Dismissal. Closing Case. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Zloch on 8/25/2017. (bc) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
June 22, 2017 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 61 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cbr)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying #57 Motion For Order Of Protection And Request For Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Zloch on 6/15/2017. (bc)
June 15, 2017 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 59 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cbr)
June 14, 2017 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order of Protection and Request for Hearing filed by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Replies due by 6/21/2017. (Thomas, Gregg)
June 13, 2017 Filing 57 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order of Protection and Request for Hearing by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Employee Doe), #2 Exhibit 2 (submitted under seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (submitted under seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (submitted under seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Declaration of Named Plaintiff Angela Monson))(O'Brien, Cullin)
June 2, 2017 Filing 56 REPLY to #55 Notice (Other),,,,,,,,,, Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' June 1, 2017 Notice by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. (Thomas, Gregg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG of Filing E-Mail (Beck, Elizabeth)
April 28, 2017 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4-25-17 before Senior Judge William J. Zloch, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-123 pages, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter Francine Salopek before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter Francine Salopek or PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2017. (fs)
April 25, 2017 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge William J. Zloch: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2017 re #44 Motion to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (bc)
April 11, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beverly Virues on behalf of KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KIMBERLY ALBERTS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CONNIE ANDERSON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KAYITE ASHCRAFT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LESTER JOHN BATES, III(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MARK BEDARD(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party NANCY BERNERS-LEE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JEN BETTERLEY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party HARRIS BIERHOFF(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TIMOTHY BINGEN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party STEFANIE BIRDSONG(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MARIANNE BLAIR(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party RICHARD BOOKER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party BARBARA BOWEN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party RICHARD BOYLAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KYLE G BRAUND(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CHRIS BUBB(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TRISTAN BURGENER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party D.J. BUSCHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party BRUCE BUSTO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JOSEPH CALLAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party PATRICIA D CASSIDY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SUSAN CATTERALL(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party VINCENT J CAUCHI(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CYNTHIA T CHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TORSHA CHILDS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KARLIE COLE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party AIMEE R COLEMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ROSALIE CONSIGLIO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DANIEL S COOPER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party YALONDA DYE COOPER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SUZANNE M CORK(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party RHIANNON CRANDALL(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party WILLIAM CRANDALL(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SHARON CRAWFORD(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party PHYLLIS CRIDDLE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JOHN CROWE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CATHERINE G CYKO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party HEATHER DADE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ALECIA R DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SHERRY DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KATHLEEN L DODGE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DIANE EMILY DREYFUS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DAN ELLIS DUDLEY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party AMALIE DUVALL(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ELIZA FEERO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ELIZABETH FIGUEROA(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DIANA FLORES(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SUSAN FRISBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ERIK FURREBOE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LISA GALE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LAURA GENNA(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party RYAN GHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JOSEPH GLEASON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JEFFREY GOLDBERG(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ESTRELLA GONZALEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LUKE GRIM(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LUCILLE GROOMS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ANTHONY GRUDIN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LAUREN HALE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JULIE HAMPTON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ZACHARY JAMES HANEY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party GAYLE ANN HARROD(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JARATH HEMPHILL(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KIRSTEN HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party REBECCA HOHM(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KIM MARIE HOULE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KIRSTEN HURST(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party BENJAMIN ILARRAZA(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party BAKH INAMOV(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DANIELLE INGRASSIA(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CAROLYN JACOBSON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TUKOI JARRETT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TIMO A JOHANN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TAMARA L JOHNSTON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party HEATHER JORDAN(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party RANA KANGAS-KENT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party BRANDY KINCAID(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party AMBER RAE KNOWLTON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party PEGGY LEW(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MELISSA LIANG(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SARAH LOPEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party EDWIN LUGO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JOHN LYNCH(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SEAN LYNCH(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CHRISTINE MAIURANO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MELISSA MARCOTTE(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party RAYMOND D MAXWELL(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party LISA ANNE MENEELY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DAVID L MEULI(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party GRETA MICKEY(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party CARL MILLER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party TERI MONACO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ANGELA MONSON(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party BRITTANY R MUSICK(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DANIEL O'MEARA(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ANDREW ORRINO(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party STEVE PHILIPP(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SUSAN PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party JANE ELLEN PLATTNER(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party ALETTE PRICHETT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party KENNETH E PUCKETT(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DAVID PULASKI(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DAVID N PYLES(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party MICHAEL S REED(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party SUSAN REED(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party VALERIE ELYSE RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added to party DANIEL J REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Beverly Virues added t
April 10, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Richard Caramanica on behalf of DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party DNC SERVICES CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ(pty:dft). (Caramanica, Mark)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint: Oral Argument set for 4/25/2017 at 1:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge William J. Zloch. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Zloch on 4/10/2017. (pes)
October 14, 2016 Filing 49 REPLY to #44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. (Thomas, Gregg)
October 4, 2016 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. Replies due by 10/14/2016. (O'Brien, Cullin)
September 21, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ re #44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Filing Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thomas, Gregg)
September 21, 2016 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Elisabeth C. Frost. re #44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg)
September 21, 2016 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Patrice Taylor. re #44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ (Thomas, Gregg)
September 21, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Thomas, Gregg)
September 2, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG re #42 Summons Returned Executed,,,,,,,,,, #41 Summons Returned Executed,,,,,,,,,, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE (Beck, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2016 Filing 42 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, KENNETH E PUCKETT, LUCILLE GROOMS, TRISTAN BURGENER, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, MELISSA MARCOTTE, CATHERINE G CYKO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, JOHN CROWE, RACHEL RODERICK, HEATHER DADE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TIMO A JOHANN, RHIANNON CRANDALL, SARAH LOPEZ, MARIANNE BLAIR, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, DAVID L MEULI, HARRIS BIERHOFF, ERIKA SITZER, LAUREN HALE, SUSAN REED, ALAINA TALBOY, RICK WASHIK, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, EMMA L YOUNG, ALETTE PRICHETT, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, CARL MILLER, GRETA MICKEY, MATTHEW SHAW, ERICH SPARKS, LISA SETTLE, DIANA FLORES, SUSAN ROPPEL, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, LISA ANNE MENEELY, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, RICHARD BOYLAN, DANIEL S COOPER, CHRIS BUBB, STANLEY RIFKEN, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, BARBARA BOWEN, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, DIANE ROBINSON, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, GAYLE ANN HARROD, ELESHA SNYDER, ZEKE SHAW, MELISSA LIANG, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, ELIZA FEERO, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, DANIEL O'MEARA, BRUCE BUSTO, ANDREW ORRINO, RICHARD BOOKER, BRETT TEEGARDIN, JEFF ROGERS, TERI MONACO, LISA GALE, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, RANA KANGAS-KENT, KIRSTEN HURST, TORSHA CHILDS, JOSEPH CALLAN, CATHERINE WILLOTT, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, DAVID PULASKI, SUSAN L SINGER, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, KARLIE COLE, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, SUSAN FRISBIE, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MARK BEDARD, STEVE PHILIPP, JOHN LYNCH, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SHERRY DAVIS, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, AMALIE DUVALL, CYNTHIA T CHAN, ANTHONY GRUDIN, TIMOTHY BINGEN, JOSEPH GLEASON, TUKOI JARRETT, DAVID N PYLES, ANNMARIE WILSON, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, SEAN LYNCH, D.J. BUSCHINI, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ALECIA R DAVIS, CONNIE ANDERSON, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, HEATHER JORDAN, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, ANGELA MONSON, LUKE GRIM, MICHAEL S REED, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, JULIE HAMPTON, LAURA GENNA, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, EDWIN LUGO, JARATH HEMPHILL, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ERIK FURREBOE, GEORGE THOMAS, CAROL WILDING, SUSAN PHILLIPS, KATHLEEN L DODGE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, BRITTANY R MUSICK, BAKH INAMOV, PEGGY LEW, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, CARLOS VILLAMAR, JAMES SIMON, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, REBECCA HOHM, RYAN GHAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, BRANDY KINCAID, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, AIMEE R COLEMAN, SUZANNE M CORK, VINCENT J CAUCHI, MARY JASMINE WELCH, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, SHARON CRAWFORD, WILLIAM CRANDALL, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, KIM MARIE HOULE, DOMINIC RONZANI, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, KYLE G BRAUND, JEN BETTERLEY. DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ served on 8/31/2016, answer due 9/21/2016. (Beck, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2016 Filing 41 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, KENNETH E PUCKETT, LUCILLE GROOMS, TRISTAN BURGENER, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, MELISSA MARCOTTE, CATHERINE G CYKO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, JOHN CROWE, RACHEL RODERICK, HEATHER DADE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TIMO A JOHANN, RHIANNON CRANDALL, SARAH LOPEZ, MARIANNE BLAIR, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, DAVID L MEULI, HARRIS BIERHOFF, ERIKA SITZER, LAUREN HALE, SUSAN REED, ALAINA TALBOY, RICK WASHIK, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, EMMA L YOUNG, ALETTE PRICHETT, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, CARL MILLER, GRETA MICKEY, MATTHEW SHAW, ERICH SPARKS, LISA SETTLE, DIANA FLORES, SUSAN ROPPEL, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, LISA ANNE MENEELY, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, RICHARD BOYLAN, DANIEL S COOPER, CHRIS BUBB, STANLEY RIFKEN, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, BARBARA BOWEN, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, DIANE ROBINSON, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, GAYLE ANN HARROD, ELESHA SNYDER, ZEKE SHAW, MELISSA LIANG, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, ELIZA FEERO, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, DANIEL O'MEARA, BRUCE BUSTO, ANDREW ORRINO, RICHARD BOOKER, BRETT TEEGARDIN, JEFF ROGERS, TERI MONACO, LISA GALE, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, RANA KANGAS-KENT, KIRSTEN HURST, TORSHA CHILDS, JOSEPH CALLAN, CATHERINE WILLOTT, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, DAVID PULASKI, SUSAN L SINGER, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, KARLIE COLE, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, SUSAN FRISBIE, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MARK BEDARD, STEVE PHILIPP, JOHN LYNCH, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SHERRY DAVIS, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, AMALIE DUVALL, CYNTHIA T CHAN, ANTHONY GRUDIN, TIMOTHY BINGEN, JOSEPH GLEASON, TUKOI JARRETT, DAVID N PYLES, ANNMARIE WILSON, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, SEAN LYNCH, D.J. BUSCHINI, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ALECIA R DAVIS, CONNIE ANDERSON, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, HEATHER JORDAN, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, ANGELA MONSON, LUKE GRIM, MICHAEL S REED, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, JULIE HAMPTON, LAURA GENNA, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, EDWIN LUGO, JARATH HEMPHILL, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ERIK FURREBOE, GEORGE THOMAS, CAROL WILDING, SUSAN PHILLIPS, KATHLEEN L DODGE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, BRITTANY R MUSICK, BAKH INAMOV, PEGGY LEW, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, CARLOS VILLAMAR, JAMES SIMON, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, REBECCA HOHM, RYAN GHAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, BRANDY KINCAID, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, AIMEE R COLEMAN, SUZANNE M CORK, VINCENT J CAUCHI, MARY JASMINE WELCH, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, SHARON CRAWFORD, WILLIAM CRANDALL, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, KIM MARIE HOULE, DOMINIC RONZANI, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, KYLE G BRAUND, JEN BETTERLEY. DNC SERVICES CORPORATION served on 8/31/2016, answer due 9/21/2016. (Beck, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Quash Service of Process or, in the Alternative, #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Service of Process as to Defendant DNC Services Corporation, d/b/a Democratic National Committee, and Defendant Deborah Wasserman Schultz be and the same is hereby QUASHED. Plaintiffs be and the same are hereby ordered to serve Defendant DNC Services Corporation, d/b/a Democratic National Committee, and Defendant Deborah Wasserman Schultz within the time prescribed by law. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/29/2016. (gp)
August 25, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE/REPLY to #38 Memorandum,,,,,,,,,, Opposition to Plaintiff's Post-Hearing Memorandum by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. (Thomas, Gregg)
August 24, 2016 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM of Law POST-HEARING by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. (O'Brien, Cullin)
August 23, 2016 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Zloch: Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/23/2016. Witness Ricardo Villalba-Cabral testified. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 954-769-5488 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov (bc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2016: #1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #2 Defendants' Exhibit List) (bc).
August 22, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ re #33 Exhibit List,,,,,,,,,,, Defendants Notice Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits (Thomas, Gregg)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/19/2016. (bc)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/19/2016. (bc)
August 19, 2016 Filing 33 Exhibit List (Plaintiffs) for August 23, 2016 Evidentiary Hearing by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Police Report Regarding death of process server Shawn Lucas), #2 Exhibit 2 (E-mail from police confirming death), #3 Exhibit 6 (Still pictures of video of service of process), #4 Exhibit 7 (Facebook pictures of Rebecca Herries), #5 Exhibit 8 (5/11/2016 email from Rebecca Herries), #6 Exhibit 9 (Facebook profile pictures of Shawn Lucas)(O'Brien, Cullin)
August 19, 2016 Filing 32 Witness List (Plaintiffs) for August 23, 2016 Evidentiary Hearing by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG.. (O'Brien, Cullin)
August 18, 2016 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Declarations of Rebecca Herries, Lindsey Reynolds, and Robert F. Bauer, and Other Inadmissible Hearsay by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. (Beck, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bruce V. Spiva is permitted to appear on behalf of Defendants. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/17/2016. (bc)
August 17, 2016 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party MARK BEDARD(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JEN BETTERLEY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party BARBARA BOWEN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party RICHARD BOYLAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KYLE G BRAUND(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CHRIS BUBB(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TRISTAN BURGENER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party D.J. BUSCHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party BRUCE BUSTO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JOSEPH CALLAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party PATRICIA D CASSIDY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SUSAN CATTERALL(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party VINCENT J CAUCHI(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CYNTHIA T CHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TORSHA CHILDS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KARLIE COLE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party AIMEE R COLEMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ROSALIE CONSIGLIO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DANIEL S COOPER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party YALONDA DYE COOPER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SUZANNE M CORK(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party RHIANNON CRANDALL(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party WILLIAM CRANDALL(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SHARON CRAWFORD(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party PHYLLIS CRIDDLE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JOHN CROWE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CATHERINE G CYKO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party HEATHER DADE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ALECIA R DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SHERRY DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KATHLEEN L DODGE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DIANE EMILY DREYFUS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DAN ELLIS DUDLEY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party AMALIE DUVALL(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ELIZA FEERO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ELIZABETH FIGUEROA(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DIANA FLORES(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SUSAN FRISBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ERIK FURREBOE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LISA GALE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LAURA GENNA(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party RYAN GHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JOSEPH GLEASON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JEFFREY GOLDBERG(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ESTRELLA GONZALEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LUKE GRIM(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LUCILLE GROOMS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ANTHONY GRUDIN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LAUREN HALE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JULIE HAMPTON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ZACHARY JAMES HANEY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party GAYLE ANN HARROD(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JARATH HEMPHILL(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KIRSTEN HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party REBECCA HOHM(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KIM MARIE HOULE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KIRSTEN HURST(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party BENJAMIN ILARRAZA(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party BAKH INAMOV(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DANIELLE INGRASSIA(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CAROLYN JACOBSON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TUKOI JARRETT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TIMO A JOHANN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TAMARA L JOHNSTON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party HEATHER JORDAN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party RANA KANGAS-KENT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party BRANDY KINCAID(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party AMBER RAE KNOWLTON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party PEGGY LEW(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party MELISSA LIANG(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SARAH LOPEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party EDWIN LUGO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JOHN LYNCH(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SEAN LYNCH(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CHRISTINE MAIURANO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party MELISSA MARCOTTE(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party RAYMOND D MAXWELL(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party LISA ANNE MENEELY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DAVID L MEULI(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party GRETA MICKEY(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party CARL MILLER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party TERI MONACO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ANGELA MONSON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party BRITTANY R MUSICK(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DANIEL O'MEARA(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ANDREW ORRINO(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party STEVE PHILIPP(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SUSAN PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JANE ELLEN PLATTNER(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party ALETTE PRICHETT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party KENNETH E PUCKETT(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DAVID PULASKI(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DAVID N PYLES(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party MICHAEL S REED(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party SUSAN REED(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party VALERIE ELYSE RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DANIEL J REYNOLDS(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party STANLEY RIFKEN(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party DIANE ROBINSON(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party RACHEL RODERICK(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck added to party JE
August 16, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bruce V. Spiva. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9007829 by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Responses due by 9/2/2016 (Thomas, Gregg)
August 15, 2016 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Elisabeth C. Frost. re #26 Response/Reply (Other) Declaration of Elisabeth C. Frost in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Quash by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg)
August 15, 2016 Filing 26 REPLY in Support to #11 Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion to Quash by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. (Thomas, Gregg) Modified title text on 8/15/2016 (asl).
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING Setting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Quash Service of Process #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer : Evidentiary Hearing is hereby set for 8/23/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William J. Zloch. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/9/2016. (gp) -Modified text on 8/30/2016 (gp).-
August 5, 2016 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by KIMBERLY ALBERTS, CONNIE ANDERSON, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, MARK BEDARD, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, JEN BETTERLEY, HARRIS BIERHOFF, TIMOTHY BINGEN, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, MARIANNE BLAIR, RICHARD BOOKER, BARBARA BOWEN, RICHARD BOYLAN, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, KYLE G BRAUND, CHRIS BUBB, TRISTAN BURGENER, D.J. BUSCHINI, BRUCE BUSTO, JOSEPH CALLAN, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, CYNTHIA T CHAN, TORSHA CHILDS, KARLIE COLE, AIMEE R COLEMAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, DANIEL S COOPER, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SUZANNE M CORK, RHIANNON CRANDALL, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, JOHN CROWE, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, CATHERINE G CYKO, HEATHER DADE, ALECIA R DAVIS, SHERRY DAVIS, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, KATHLEEN L DODGE, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, AMALIE DUVALL, ELIZA FEERO, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, DIANA FLORES, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, SUSAN FRISBIE, ERIK FURREBOE, LISA GALE, LAURA GENNA, RYAN GHAN, JOSEPH GLEASON, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, LUKE GRIM, LUCILLE GROOMS, ANTHONY GRUDIN, LAUREN HALE, JULIE HAMPTON, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, GAYLE ANN HARROD, JARATH HEMPHILL, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, REBECCA HOHM, KIM MARIE HOULE, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, KIRSTEN HURST, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, BAKH INAMOV, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TUKOI JARRETT, TIMO A JOHANN, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, HEATHER JORDAN, RANA KANGAS-KENT, BRANDY KINCAID, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, PEGGY LEW, MELISSA LIANG, SARAH LOPEZ, EDWIN LUGO, JOHN LYNCH, SEAN LYNCH, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, MELISSA MARCOTTE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, LISA ANNE MENEELY, DAVID L MEULI, GRETA MICKEY, CARL MILLER, TERI MONACO, ANGELA MONSON, BRITTANY R MUSICK, DANIEL O'MEARA, ANDREW ORRINO, STEVE PHILIPP, SUSAN PHILLIPS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, ALETTE PRICHETT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, KENNETH E PUCKETT, DAVID PULASKI, DAVID N PYLES, MICHAEL S REED, SUSAN REED, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, STANLEY RIFKEN, DIANE ROBINSON, RACHEL RODERICK, JEFF ROGERS, DOMINIC RONZANI, SUSAN ROPPEL, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, LISA SETTLE, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, MATTHEW SHAW, ZEKE SHAW, JAMES SIMON, SUSAN L SINGER, ERIKA SITZER, BRENDA LEE SMITH, ELESHA SNYDER, ERICH SPARKS, ALAINA TALBOY, FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, BRETT TEEGARDIN, GEORGE THOMAS, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, CARLOS VILLAMAR, RICK WASHIK, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, MARY JASMINE WELCH, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, CAROL WILDING, CATHERINE WILLOTT, ANNMARIE WILSON, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, EMMA L YOUNG. Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party MARK BEDARD(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JEN BETTERLEY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party BARBARA BOWEN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party RICHARD BOYLAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KYLE G BRAUND(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CHRIS BUBB(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TRISTAN BURGENER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party D.J. BUSCHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party BRUCE BUSTO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JOSEPH CALLAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party PATRICIA D CASSIDY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SUSAN CATTERALL(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party VINCENT J CAUCHI(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CYNTHIA T CHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TORSHA CHILDS(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KARLIE COLE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party AIMEE R COLEMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ROSALIE CONSIGLIO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DANIEL S COOPER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party YALONDA DYE COOPER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SUZANNE M CORK(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party RHIANNON CRANDALL(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party WILLIAM CRANDALL(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SHARON CRAWFORD(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party PHYLLIS CRIDDLE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JOHN CROWE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CATHERINE G CYKO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party HEATHER DADE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ALECIA R DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SHERRY DAVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KATHLEEN L DODGE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DIANE EMILY DREYFUS(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DAN ELLIS DUDLEY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party AMALIE DUVALL(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ELIZA FEERO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ELIZABETH FIGUEROA(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DIANA FLORES(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SUSAN FRISBIE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ERIK FURREBOE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LISA GALE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LAURA GENNA(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party RYAN GHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JOSEPH GLEASON(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JEFFREY GOLDBERG(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ESTRELLA GONZALEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LUKE GRIM(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LUCILLE GROOMS(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ANTHONY GRUDIN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LAUREN HALE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JULIE HAMPTON(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ZACHARY JAMES HANEY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party GAYLE ANN HARROD(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JARATH HEMPHILL(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KIRSTEN HOFFMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party REBECCA HOHM(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KIM MARIE HOULE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KIRSTEN HURST(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party BENJAMIN ILARRAZA(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party BAKH INAMOV(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DANIELLE INGRASSIA(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CAROLYN JACOBSON(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TUKOI JARRETT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TIMO A JOHANN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TAMARA L JOHNSTON(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party HEATHER JORDAN(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party RANA KANGAS-KENT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party BRANDY KINCAID(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party AMBER RAE KNOWLTON(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party PEGGY LEW(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party MELISSA LIANG(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SARAH LOPEZ(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party EDWIN LUGO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JOHN LYNCH(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SEAN LYNCH(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CHRISTINE MAIURANO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party MELISSA MARCOTTE(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party RAYMOND D MAXWELL(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party LISA ANNE MENEELY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DAVID L MEULI(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party GRETA MICKEY(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party CARL MILLER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TERI MONACO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ANGELA MONSON(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party BRITTANY R MUSICK(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DANIEL O'MEARA(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ANDREW ORRINO(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party STEVE PHILIPP(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SUSAN PHILLIPS(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party JANE ELLEN PLATTNER(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party ALETTE PRICHETT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party KENNETH E PUCKETT(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DAVID PULASKI(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party DAVID N PYLES(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party MICHAEL S REED(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party SUSAN REED(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party VALERIE ELYSE RESCH(pty:pla), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 , #20 , #21 and #22 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Marc E. Elias, Elisabeth C. Frost, Ruthzee Louijeune and Graham Wilson are permitted to appear on behalf of Defendants. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/4/2016. (bc)
August 2, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Graham Wilson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8968480 by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Responses due by 8/19/2016 (Thomas, Gregg)
August 2, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ruthzee Louijeune. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8968459 by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Responses due by 8/19/2016 (Thomas, Gregg)
August 2, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elisabeth C. Frost. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8968439 by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Responses due by 8/19/2016 (Thomas, Gregg)
August 2, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Marc E. Elias. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8968404 by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/19/2016 (Thomas, Gregg)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER denying #15 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/29/2016. (bc)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Intervene. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Steve Schonberg. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/26/2016. (bc)
July 25, 2016 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Schonberg re #15 MOTION to Intervene. (jas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 15 Expedited MOTION to Intervene by Steve Schonberg. (jas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (asl)
July 25, 2016 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Memorandum. All Parties Filing Document Were Not Selected; ERROR - All Parties filing the document were not selected. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)
July 22, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Thomas, Gregg)
July 22, 2016 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, Deborah Wasserman Schultz. (Thomas, Gregg) Modified to add missing filer on 7/25/2016 (asl).
July 22, 2016 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, Declaration of Rebecca Herries by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION (Thomas, Gregg)
July 22, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Service of Process #1 Complaint by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION. Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party DNC SERVICES CORPORATION(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/8/2016 (Thomas, Gregg). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer on 7/25/2016 (asl). -Modified/Construed as a Motion to Quash per #25 Order on 8/30/2016 (gp).-
July 13, 2016 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, KENNETH E PUCKETT, LUCILLE GROOMS, TRISTAN BURGENER, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, CATHERINE G CYKO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, RACHEL RODERICK, HEATHER DADE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TIMO A JOHANN, RHIANNON CRANDALL, MARIANNE BLAIR, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, DAVID L MEULI, HARRIS BIERHOFF, LAUREN HALE, SUSAN REED, RICK WASHIK, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, EMMA L YOUNG, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, GRETA MICKEY, MATTHEW SHAW, ERICH SPARKS, LISA SETTLE, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, LISA ANNE MENEELY, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, DANIEL S COOPER, CHRIS BUBB, STANLEY RIFKEN, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, ELESHA SNYDER, ZEKE SHAW, MELISSA LIANG, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, DANIEL O'MEARA, BRUCE BUSTO, RICHARD BOOKER, BRETT TEEGARDIN, JEFF ROGERS, LISA GALE, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, RANA KANGAS-KENT, KIRSTEN HURST, CATHERINE WILLOTT, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, DAVID PULASKI, SUSAN L SINGER, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, KARLIE COLE, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, SUSAN FRISBIE, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, JOHN LYNCH, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SHERRY DAVIS, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, CYNTHIA T CHAN, ANTHONY GRUDIN, TIMOTHY BINGEN, JOSEPH GLEASON, DAVID N PYLES, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, SEAN LYNCH, D.J. BUSCHINI, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, ALECIA R DAVIS, CONNIE ANDERSON, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, HEATHER JORDAN, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, ANGELA MONSON, LUKE GRIM, MICHAEL S REED, JULIE HAMPTON, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, LAURA GENNA, EDWIN LUGO, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ERIK FURREBOE, CAROL WILDING, KATHLEEN L DODGE, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, BRITTANY R MUSICK, BAKH INAMOV, PEGGY LEW, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, JAMES SIMON, CARLOS VILLAMAR, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, RYAN GHAN, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, BRANDY KINCAID, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, AIMEE R COLEMAN, SUZANNE M CORK, MARY JASMINE WELCH, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, WILLIAM CRANDALL, SHARON CRAWFORD, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, KIM MARIE HOULE, DOMINIC RONZANI, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, KYLE G BRAUND, CARL MILLER, JULIANNA SEYMOUR, TUKOI JARRETT, STEVE PHILIPP, AMALIE DUVALL, VINCENT J CAUCHI, STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT, REBECCA HOHM, ANDREW ORRINO, JARATH HEMPHILL, RICHARD BOYLAN, SARAH LOPEZ, GEORGE THOMAS, JEN BETTERLEY, ELIZA FEERO, SUSAN ROPPEL, GAYLE ANN HARROD, ALETTE PRICHETT, BARBARA BOWEN, JOHN CROWE, MELISSA MARCOTTE, DIANE ROBINSON, JOSEPH CALLAN, DIANA FLORES, CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER, ANNMARIE WILSON, ERIKA SITZER, DANIELLE INGRASSIA, ALAINA TALBOY, REBECCA WHITE-HAYES, MARK BEDARD, SUSAN PHILLIPS, TERI MONACO, TORSHA CHILDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Beck, Jared)
July 6, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, SUSAN L SINGER, KENNETH E PUCKETT, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, LUCILLE GROOMS, TRISTAN BURGENER, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, KARLIE COLE, SHARON JANIS, SUSAN FRISBIE, CATHERINE G CYKO, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, RACHEL RODERICK, HEATHER DADE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, JOHN LYNCH, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TIMO A JOHANN, RHIANNON CRANDALL, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SHERRY DAVIS, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, MARIANNE BLAIR, CYNTHIA T CHAN, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, ANTHONY GRUDIN, DAVID L MEULI, TIMOTHY BINGEN, HARRIS BIERHOFF, JOSEPH GLEASON, LAUREN HALE, SUSAN REED, DAVID N PYLES, RICK WASHIK, SEAN LYNCH, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, D.J. BUSCHINI, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, ALECIA R DAVIS, CONNIE ANDERSON, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, HEATHER JORDAN, GRETA MICKEY, ANGELA MONSON, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, KATHRYN BAILEY CONANT, MATTHEW SHAW, ERICH SPARKS, LUKE GRIM, LISA SETTLE, MICHAEL S REED, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, JULIE HAMPTON, LISA ANNE MENEELY, LAURA GENNA, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, DANIEL S COOPER, EDWIN LUGO, CHRIS BUBB, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ERIK FURREBOE, STANLEY RIFKEN, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, KATHLEEN L DODGE, BRITTANY R MUSICK, BAKH INAMOV, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, PEGGY LEW, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, CARLOS VILLAMAR, JAMES SIMON, ELESHA SNYDER, ZEKE SHAW, MELISSA LIANG, RYAN GHAN, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, DANIEL O'MEARA, BRUCE BUSTO, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, RICHARD BOOKER, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, BRANDY KINCAID, TWANA SPARKS, BRETT TEEGARDIN, AIMEE R COLEMAN, JEFF ROGERS, SUZANNE M CORK, MARY JASMINE WELCH, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, SHARON CRAWFORD, WILLIAM CRANDALL, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, DOMINIC RONZANI, AUSTIN DREIS-ORNELAS, KIM MARIE HOULE, LISA GALE, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, RANA KANGAS-KENT, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, KYLE G BRAUND, KIRSTEN HURST, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, DAVID PULASKI. DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ served on 7/1/2016, answer due 7/22/2016. (Beck, Jared)
July 6, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, SUSAN L SINGER, KENNETH E PUCKETT, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, LUCILLE GROOMS, TRISTAN BURGENER, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, KARLIE COLE, SHARON JANIS, SUSAN FRISBIE, CATHERINE G CYKO, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, RACHEL RODERICK, HEATHER DADE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, JOHN LYNCH, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TIMO A JOHANN, RHIANNON CRANDALL, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SHERRY DAVIS, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, MARIANNE BLAIR, CYNTHIA T CHAN, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, ANTHONY GRUDIN, DAVID L MEULI, TIMOTHY BINGEN, HARRIS BIERHOFF, JOSEPH GLEASON, LAUREN HALE, SUSAN REED, DAVID N PYLES, RICK WASHIK, SEAN LYNCH, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, D.J. BUSCHINI, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, ALECIA R DAVIS, CONNIE ANDERSON, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, HEATHER JORDAN, GRETA MICKEY, ANGELA MONSON, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, KATHRYN BAILEY CONANT, MATTHEW SHAW, ERICH SPARKS, LUKE GRIM, LISA SETTLE, MICHAEL S REED, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, JULIE HAMPTON, LISA ANNE MENEELY, LAURA GENNA, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, DANIEL S COOPER, EDWIN LUGO, CHRIS BUBB, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ERIK FURREBOE, STANLEY RIFKEN, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, CAROL WILDING, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, KATHLEEN L DODGE, BRITTANY R MUSICK, BAKH INAMOV, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, PEGGY LEW, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, CARLOS VILLAMAR, JAMES SIMON, ELESHA SNYDER, ZEKE SHAW, MELISSA LIANG, RYAN GHAN, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, DANIEL O'MEARA, BRUCE BUSTO, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, RICHARD BOOKER, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, BRANDY KINCAID, TWANA SPARKS, BRETT TEEGARDIN, AIMEE R COLEMAN, JEFF ROGERS, SUZANNE M CORK, MARY JASMINE WELCH, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, SHARON CRAWFORD, WILLIAM CRANDALL, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, DOMINIC RONZANI, AUSTIN DREIS-ORNELAS, KIM MARIE HOULE, LISA GALE, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, RANA KANGAS-KENT, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, KYLE G BRAUND, KIRSTEN HURST, CATHERINE WILLOTT, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, DAVID PULASKI. DNC SERVICES CORPORATION served on 7/1/2016, answer due 7/22/2016. (Beck, Jared)
June 30, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ. (srd)
June 30, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DNC SERVICES CORPORATION. (srd)
June 28, 2016 Filing 3 Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd)
June 28, 2016 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge William J. Zloch (srd)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8870211, filed by FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR, SUSAN L SINGER, KENNETH E PUCKETT, TAMARA L JOHNSTON, MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY, LUCILLE GROOMS, TRISTAN BURGENER, KIRSTEN HOFFMAN, JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, DANIEL J REYNOLDS, KARLIE COLE, SHARON JANIS, SUSAN FRISBIE, CATHERINE G CYKO, CHRISTINE MAIURANO, ZACHARY JAMES HANEY, RACHEL RODERICK, HEATHER DADE, BRENDA LEE SMITH, JOHN LYNCH, CAROLYN JACOBSON, TIMO A JOHANN, RHIANNON CRANDALL, YALONDA DYE COOPER, SHERRY DAVIS, DIANE EMILY DREYFUS, MARIANNE BLAIR, CYNTHIA T CHAN, NANCY BERNERS-LEE, ANTHONY GRUDIN, DAVID L MEULI, TIMOTHY BINGEN, HARRIS BIERHOFF, JOSEPH GLEASON, LAUREN HALE, SUSAN REED, DAVID N PYLES, RICK WASHIK, SEAN LYNCH, TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER, D.J. BUSCHINI, JEFFREY GOLDBERG, STEFANIE BIRDSONG, EMMA L YOUNG, PATRICIA D CASSIDY, SUSAN CATTERALL, ALECIA R DAVIS, CONNIE ANDERSON, ANDREW ROUSSEAU, HEATHER JORDAN, GRETA MICKEY, ANGELA MONSON, ELIZABETH FIGUEROA, KATHRYN BAILEY CONANT, MATTHEW SHAW, ERICH SPARKS, LUKE GRIM, LISA SETTLE, MICHAEL S REED, LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN, THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT, LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV, JULIE HAMPTON, LISA ANNE MENEELY, LAURA GENNA, LESTER JOHN BATES, III, DANIEL S COOPER, EDWIN LUGO, CHRIS BUBB, BENJAMIN ILARRAZA, ERIK FURREBOE, STANLEY RIFKEN, ESTRELLA GONZALEZ, CAROL WILDING, RAYMOND D MAXWELL, KATHLEEN L DODGE, BRITTANY R MUSICK, BAKH INAMOV, PHYLLIS CRIDDLE, PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN, PEGGY LEW, MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK, ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT, GREGORY WITKOWSKI, CARLOS VILLAMAR, JAMES SIMON, ELESHA SNYDER, ZEKE SHAW, MELISSA LIANG, RYAN GHAN, KAYITE ASHCRAFT, DANIEL O'MEARA, BRUCE BUSTO, ROSALIE CONSIGLIO, RICHARD BOOKER, VALERIE ELYSE RESCH, BRANDY KINCAID, TWANA SPARKS, BRETT TEEGARDIN, AIMEE R COLEMAN, JEFF ROGERS, SUZANNE M CORK, MARY JASMINE WELCH, DAN ELLIS DUDLEY, SHARON CRAWFORD, WILLIAM CRANDALL, AMBER RAE KNOWLTON, DOMINIC RONZANI, AUSTIN DREIS-ORNELAS, KIM MARIE HOULE, LISA GALE, DUFFY ROBERT WEISS, JANE ELLEN PLATTNER, RANA KANGAS-KENT, WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ, KYLE G BRAUND, KIRSTEN HURST, CATHERINE WILLOTT, KIMBERLY ALBERTS, DAVID PULASKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) DNC, #4 Summon(s) Schultz)(Beck, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILDING et al v. DNC SERVICES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN HOUSEKNECHT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID L MEULI
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRSTEN HOFFMAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA BOWEN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY WITKOWSKI
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL MILLER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIANNA SEYMOUR
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY BERNERS-LEE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS VILLAMAR
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELESHA SNYDER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND D MAXWELL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIC RONZANI
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUKE GRIM
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER JORDAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ALBERTS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZEKE SHAW
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUFFY ROBERT WEISS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUKOI JARRETT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA LIANG
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GOLDBERG
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW ORRINO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER RAE KNOWLTON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERI MONACO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALETTE PRICHETT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE ROBINSON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN ELLIS DUDLEY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH GLEASON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK BEDARD
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA SETTLE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE THOMAS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK MICHAEL FERRAGUT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT J CAUCHI
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE ELLEN PLATTNER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETA MICKEY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY DEITCH-COULTER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH FIGUEROA
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY JAMES HANEY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY JASMINE WELCH
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE M CORK
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHIANNON CRANDALL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN L SINGER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW JOSEPH BRADY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCILLE GROOMS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA L JOHNSTON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY GRUDIN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN LYNCH
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S REED
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL O'MEARA
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEN BETTERLEY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYLE ANN HARROD
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM MARIE HOULE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.J. BUSCHINI
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA T CHAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIKA SITZER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA WHITE-HAYES
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZA FEERO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARATH HEMPHILL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER DADE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG RICHARD CURRIER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLOWE ST. CLOUD PRIMACK
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANA KANGAS-KENT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE ELYSE RESCH
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE MAIURANO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARLIE COLE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWANA SPARKS
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALECIA R DAVIS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER JOHN BATES, III
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID PULASKI
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA MICHELLE TAYLOR
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CRANDALL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN JACOBSON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNMARIE WILSON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY KINCAID
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMALIE DUVALL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BOYLAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY LEW
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE HAMPTON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN ROPPEL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN FRISBIE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSALIE CONSIGLIO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA L YOUNG
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN GHAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA GENNA
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SIMON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J REYNOLDS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRISTAN BURGENER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE PHILIPP
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT TEEGARDIN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUSTIN DREIS-ORNELAS
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICK WASHIK
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON JANIS
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK FURREBOE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA LEE SMITH
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY R MUSICK
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY DAVIS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY BINGEN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEWIS L HUMISTON, IV
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA D CASSIDY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE EMILY DREYFUS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LYNCH
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA MONSON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA FLORES
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH E PUCKETT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF ROGERS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CROWE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE BUSTO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID N PYLES
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW SHAW
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRABU GOPALAKRISHNAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE G CYKO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRSTEN HURST
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE ANDERSON
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL RODERICK
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON CRAWFORD
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MARCOTTE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYITE ASHCRAFT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE WILLOTT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YALONDA DYE COOPER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAKH INAMOV
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE G BRAUND
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE INGRASSIA
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN LUGO
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA MICHELLE VAUGHN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA GALE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SCOTT FRANZ
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CALLAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICH SPARKS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN ILARRAZA
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAINA TALBOY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA HOHM
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEFANIE BIRDSONG
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIMEE R COLEMAN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL WILDING
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANNE BLAIR
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN HALE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN L DODGE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN CATTERALL
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTRELLA GONZALEZ
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEDA LARSON-WRIGHT
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS CRIDDLE
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN BAILEY CONANT
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL S COOPER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH LOPEZ
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRIS BIERHOFF
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN PHILLIPS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY RIFKEN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS BUBB
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA ANNE MENEELY
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN REED
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW ROUSSEAU
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMO A JOHANN
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BOOKER
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Antonio Gabriel Hernandez
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TORSHA CHILDS
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Represented By: Jared H. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNC SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Graham Wilson
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Ruthzee Louijeune
Represented By: Bruce V. Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Steve Schonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?