B&D Nutritional Ingredients v. Unique Bio Ingredients, LLC et al
Plaintiff: B&D Nutritional Ingredients, Inc.
Defendant: Unique Bio Ingredients, LLC, Jairo Escobar, Luis Echeverria, Ratna Sudha Madempudi and Unique Biotech Limited
Case Number: 0:2016cv62364
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 226 and 221 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/24/2017. (pb00)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER on Joint Status Report 202 regarding discovery. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/26/2017. (pb00)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying 191 Defendants' Motion Reclassify Plaintiff's Customer List. Defendants are directed to produce their customer lists by Friday, 6/23/2017. The parties are to meet and confer and submit a Notice of Compliance by 6/30/2017. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/20/2017. (pb00)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying as moot 166 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part 166 Motion to Compel. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/24/2017. (pb00)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 178 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Its Motion to Overrule Objections to Interrogatories. Please see Order for details and the Court's schedule for resolving outstanding discovery issues. A Joint Status Report is due by June 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/19/2017. (pb00)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying 174 Plaintiff's Motion to Overrule Objections to Interrogatories. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/16/2017. (pb00)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 159 Plaintiff's Motion to Overrule Objections Based on Rule 33(a). Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/15/2017. (pb00)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying 92 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 2/13/2017. (pb00)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&D Nutritional Ingredients v. Unique Bio Ingredients, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&D Nutritional Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By: Nolan Keith Klein
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Bio Ingredients, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jairo Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratna Sudha Madempudi
Represented By: Richard A. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Biotech Limited
Represented By: Richard A. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?