Kenzo S.A. v. 1one2two3three et al
Plaintiff: Kenzo S.A.
Defendant: 1one2two3three, Lindatson, ANTO NIOE SPARZA, GladysG, OLE&BARAJA, Makayla M. Robinson, TITUS HARRIS, Baoleng, Nin Cheryl, blackFriday Go~, TOYA&SMI, subsequent, Florencen, TT Home, YESISBO, GDHKD STORE, ANNI-UO, HERET CADR, HenriettaLennon, htgc, Orangecheng, Use Up, amanda carpenter, Mazing family, Big Hug you, Closer to U, Discovery STORE, Carol Leffler, huang9999, Ingemars, Oyer, La wanniao, JoyFly, S beehouse, RODEM, BETASU, Castillo85684, Haness, Jessica Versactton, lfjyeuoop, Lori Forder, Lisa M Hart, Robertce, CHRNAS, AUSTRME, changes242 somesdior33, Melissa Coombs, Coloryou, karen mckinney, TWSTE, Abby Amy, Ashley K. Rodriguez, Ronchang, etjtyif, Isabella Thompson, Arreolas fashion tshirts 2016, Patricia YIW, MARY MEYE LOCR, Jody Steer, Poppy Newbold, Input, Frazierly moon 2016, FASTGCT, TYRONE MCDONALD, Robert Delaney, Enjoy U Life, AMJUK M30, Pin Bo, steciakcase, Sharon R Tyson, Denver Bergin ss, sHernandez, Sanpositar, SHA PIT TMA, WILLIE MURPHY, ONBR&INKLE, AnnickelRajottey, Louise Dallairek and Suezengky Yang
Case Number: 0:2016cv63030
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AUSTRME re #41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment, filed by TWSTE, FASTGCT, etjtyif, RODEM, CHRNAS, BETASU, AUSTRME (Rothman, Joel)
July 19, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment . Responses due by 8/2/2017. SEE DE 46 ORDER (ail)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Vacate Default Judgment on or before August 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
July 18, 2017 Filing 45 Clerks Notice to Filer re #44 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Vacate Default Judgment re #41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment, . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 17, 2017 Filing 44 Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment, by Kenzo S.A.. Responses due by 7/31/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez-Albizu, T.) Modified Relief on 7/18/2017 (ls).
June 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment, . Responses due by 7/19/2017. SEE DE 43 ORDER (ail)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Vacate Default on or before July 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
June 28, 2017 Filing 42 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Vacate Default Judgment re #41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment, by Kenzo S.A.. Responses due by 7/12/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
June 21, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION to Vacate #39 Default Judgment, by AUSTRME, BETASU, CHRNAS, FASTGCT, RODEM, TWSTE, etjtyif. Responses due by 7/5/2017 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jinxiang Huang)(Rothman, Joel)
June 20, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of AUSTRME, BETASU, CHRNAS, FASTGCT, RODEM, TWSTE, etjtyif. Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party AUSTRME(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party BETASU(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party CHRNAS(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party FASTGCT(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party RODEM(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party TWSTE(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party etjtyif(pty:dft). (Rothman, Joel)
April 25, 2017 Filing 39 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 24, 2017 Filing 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Rodriguez-Albizu in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment And Permanent Injunction)(Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
April 3, 2017 Filing 36 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2017-18 to Magistrate Judge Alicia Otazo-Reyes. (vp)
March 14, 2017 Filing 35 Clerks Entry of Default as to 1one2two3three, AMJUK M30, ANNI-UO, ANTO NIOE SPARZA, AUSTRME, Abby Amy, AnnickelRajottey, Arreolas fashion tshirts 2016, BETASU, Baoleng, Big Hug you, CHRNAS, Carol Leffler, Castillo85684, Closer to U, Coloryou, Denver Bergin ss, Discovery STORE, Enjoy U Life, FASTGCT, Florencen, Frazierly moon 2016, GDHKD STORE, GladysG, HERET CADR, Haness, HenriettaLennon, Ingemars, Input, Isabella Thompson, Jessica Versactton, Jody Steer, JoyFly, Kenzo S.A., La wanniao, Lindatson, Lisa M Hart, Lori Forder, Louise Dallairek, MARY MEYE LOCR, Mazing family, Melissa Coombs, Nin Cheryl, OLE&BARAJA, ONBR&INKLE, Orangecheng, Oyer, Patricia YIW, Pin Bo, Poppy Newbold, RODEM, Robert Delaney, Robertce, Makayla M. Robinson, Ashley K. Rodriguez, Ronchang, S beehouse, SHA PIT TMA, Sanpositar, Sharon R Tyson, Suezengky Yang, TITUS HARRIS, TOYA&SMI, TT Home, TWSTE, TYRONE MCDONALD, Use Up, WILLIE MURPHY, YESISBO, amanda carpenter, blackFriday Go, changes242 somesdior33, etjtyif, htgc, huang9999, karen mckinney, lfjyeuoop, sHernandez, steciakcase, subsequent - Motions Terminated: #34 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/14/2017. (dj)
March 14, 2017 Filing 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 1one2two3three, AMJUK M30, ANNI-UO, ANTO NIOE SPARZA, AUSTRME, Abby Amy, AnnickelRajottey, Arreolas fashion tshirts 2016, BETASU, Baoleng, Big Hug you, CHRNAS, Carol Leffler, Castillo85684, Closer to U, Coloryou, Denver Bergin ss, Discovery STORE, Enjoy U Life, FASTGCT, Florencen, Frazierly moon 2016, GDHKD STORE, GladysG, HERET CADR, Haness, HenriettaLennon, Ingemars, Input, Isabella Thompson, Jessica Versactton, Jody Steer, JoyFly, La wanniao, Lindatson, Lisa M Hart, Lori Forder, Louise Dallairek, MARY MEYE LOCR, Mazing family, Melissa Coombs, Nin Cheryl, OLE&BARAJA, ONBR&INKLE, Orangecheng, Oyer, Patricia YIW, Pin Bo, Poppy Newbold, RODEM, Robert Delaney, Robertce, Makayla M. Robinson, Ashley K. Rodriguez, Ronchang, S beehouse, SHA PIT TMA, Sanpositar, Sharon R Tyson, Suezengky Yang, TITUS HARRIS, TOYA&SMI, TT Home, TWSTE, TYRONE MCDONALD, Use Up, WILLIE MURPHY, YESISBO, amanda carpenter, blackFriday Go, changes242 somesdior33, etjtyif, htgc, huang9999, karen mckinney, lfjyeuoop, sHernandez, steciakcase, subsequent by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 7, 2017 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenzo S.A. re 31 Endorsed Order, 30 Motion Hearing, #29 Preliminary Injunction via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 7, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenzo S.A. re #29 Preliminary Injunction upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Endorsed Order revising minute entry. The hearing on the preliminary injunction was on 2/28/2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
March 1, 2017 Filing 30 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Motion Hearing held on 3/1/2017 re #7 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets filed by Kenzo S.A. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Rodriguez-Albizu. Defendants did not appear. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hs01)
February 28, 2017 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
February 27, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE by Kenzo S.A. Of E-Mail Inquiry Received From Defendant 28 In Connection With Asset Restraint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 To The Notice Of E-Mail Inquiry Received From Defendant 28 In Connection With Asset Restraint) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
February 24, 2017 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenzo S.A. re #12 Bond, #3 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge, #21 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Unseal , #20 Order on Sealed Motion, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Order on Sealed Motion, #14 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated January 4, 2017 and to Continue Hearing Scheduled For January 19, 2017, #9 Order on Motion to Seal, #10 Order on Sealed Motion, #7 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets, #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #5 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement, Set/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings, #16 Sealed Order, #19 Second SEALED MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DATED JANUARY 4, 2017 AND TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2017 IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, 22 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1 Complaint via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 24, 2017 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenzo S.A. re #12 Bond, #3 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge, #20 Order on Sealed Motion, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Order on Sealed Motion, #14 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated January 4, 2017 and to Continue Hearing Scheduled For January 19, 2017, #9 Order on Motion to Seal, #10 Order on Sealed Motion, #7 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets, #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #5 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 Sealed Order, Set/Reset Hearings, #19 Second SEALED MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DATED JANUARY 4, 2017 AND TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2017 IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #1 Complaint upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 24, 2017 Filing 25 SERVICE (Proof) by Publication by Kenzo S.A.. Last Publication date 2/2/2017. Claims/Positions/Written Defenses/Answers/etc., due by 3/6/2017. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 24, 2017 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Kenzo S.A.. 1one2two3three served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; AMJUK M30 served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; ANNI-UO served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; ANTO NIOE SPARZA served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; AUSTRME served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Abby Amy served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; AnnickelRajottey served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Arreolas fashion tshirts 2016 served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; BETASU served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Baoleng served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Big Hug you served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; CHRNAS served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Carol Leffler served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Castillo85684 served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Closer to U served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Coloryou served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Denver Bergin ss served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Discovery STORE served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Enjoy U Life served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; FASTGCT served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Florencen served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Frazierly moon 2016 served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; GDHKD STORE served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; GladysG served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; HERET CADR served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Haness served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; HenriettaLennon served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Ingemars served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Input served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Isabella Thompson served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Jessica Versactton served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Jody Steer served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; JoyFly served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; La wanniao served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Lindatson served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Lisa M Hart served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Lori Forder served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Louise Dallairek served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; MARY MEYE LOCR served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Mazing family served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Melissa Coombs served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Nin Cheryl served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; OLE&BARAJA served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; ONBR&INKLE served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Orangecheng served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Oyer served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Patricia YIW served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Pin Bo served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Poppy Newbold served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; RODEM served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Robert Delaney served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Robertce served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Makayla M. Robinson served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Ashley K. Rodriguez served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Ronchang served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; S beehouse served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; SHA PIT TMA served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Sanpositar served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Sharon R Tyson served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Suezengky Yang served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; TITUS HARRIS served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; TOYA&SMI served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; TT Home served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; TWSTE served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; TYRONE MCDONALD served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; Use Up served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; WILLIE MURPHY served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; YESISBO served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; amanda carpenter served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; blackFriday Go served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; changes242 somesdior33 served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; etjtyif served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; htgc served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; huang9999 served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; karen mckinney served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; lfjyeuoop served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; sHernandez served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; steciakcase served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017; subsequent served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
February 16, 2017 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing Sealed Documents pusuant to 22 Endorsed Order (nc)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal all docket entries in this case, and return those portions of the Court file to the public records. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
February 10, 2017 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Unseal by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Second Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing. Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued until Tuesday, 2/28/2017 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/7/2017. (See Order for full details) (nc) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
February 8, 2017 Set/Hearings Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued until Tuesday, 2/28/2017 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (nc) Modified by Unsealing pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
February 1, 2017 Filing 19 Second MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DATED JANUARY 4, 2017 AND TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2017 IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of T. Raquel Rodriguez-Albizu In Support Of Plaintiffs Second Motion To Extend Temporary Restraining Order And To Continue Hearing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 23, 2017 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to 1one2two3three, AMJUK M30, ANNI-UO, ANTO NIOE SPARZA, AUSTRME, Abby Amy, AnnickelRajottey, Arreolas fashion tshirts 2016, BETASU, Baoleng, Big Hug you, CHRNAS, Carol Leffler, Castillo85684, Closer to U, Coloryou, Denver Bergin ss, Discovery STORE, Enjoy U Life, FASTGCT, Florencen, Frazierly moon 2016, GDHKD STORE, GladysG, HERET CADR, Haness, HenriettaLennon, Ingemars, Input, Isabella Thompson, Jessica Versactton, Jody Steer, JoyFly, La wanniao, Lindatson, Lisa M Hart, Lori Forder, Louise Dallairek, MARY MEYE LOCR, Mazing family, Melissa Coombs, Nin Cheryl, OLE&BARAJA, ONBR&INKLE, Orangecheng, Oyer, Patricia YIW, Pin Bo, Poppy Newbold, RODEM, Robert Delaney, Robertce, Makayla M. Robinson, Ashley K. Rodriguez, Ronchang, S beehouse, SHA PIT TMA, Sanpositar, Sharon R Tyson, Suezengky Yang, TITUS HARRIS, TOYA&SMI, TT Home, TWSTE, TYRONE MCDONALD, Use Up, WILLIE MURPHY, YESISBO, amanda carpenter, blackFriday Go, changes242 somesdior33, etjtyif, htgc, huang9999, karen mckinney, lfjyeuoop, sHernandez, steciakcase, subsequent. (asl)
January 20, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Kenzo S.A. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Amended Order Granting #14 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated January 4, 2017 and to Continue Hearing Scheduled For January 19, 2017. Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued until 2/2/2017 12:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/19/2017. (nc) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 19, 2017 Set/Hearings : Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued to 2/2/2017 12:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (nc) Modified by Unsealing pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated January 4, 2017 and to Continue Hearing Scheduled For January 19, 2017. Preliminary Injunction Hearing continued until 2/3/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/17/2017. (nc) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 17, 2017 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated January 4, 2017 and to Continue Hearing Scheduled For January 19, 2017 by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Rodriguez-Albizu in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/11/2017. (See Order for full details) (nc) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 10, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Seizure BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 receipt # 06-03003351 posted by Kenzo S.A. (ail)
January 10, 2017 Filing 11 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Raquel Rodriguez-Albizu in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of T. Raquel Rodriguez-Albizu, #3 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #7 Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/19/2017 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/4/2017. (See Order for full details) (nc) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/4/2017. (See Order for full details) (nc)
January 4, 2017 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kenzo S.A. identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton, SE, Corporate Parent LV Group SA for Kenzo S.A. (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
December 29, 2016 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hadrien Huet in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Hadrien Huet, #3 Declaration of T. Raquel Rodriguez-Albizu in Support Thereof, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of T. Raquel Rodriguez-Albizu, #5 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #6 Exhibit 1, part 1, to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #7 Exhibit 1, part 2, to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 22 Endorsed Order on 2/16/2017 (nc).
December 29, 2016 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
December 29, 2016 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kenzo S.A. identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton, SE, Corporate Parent LVMH Fashion Group SA for Kenzo S.A. (Rodriguez-Albizu, T.)
December 27, 2016 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lrz1)
December 27, 2016 Filing 3 Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz1)
December 27, 2016 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lrz1)
December 27, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9359322, filed by Kenzo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenzo S.A. v. 1one2two3three et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1one2two3three
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindatson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTO NIOE SPARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GladysG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLE&BARAJA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makayla M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITUS HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baoleng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nin Cheryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: blackFriday Go~
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYA&SMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: subsequent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florencen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YESISBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDHKD STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNI-UO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERET CADR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HenriettaLennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: htgc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangecheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Use Up
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: amanda carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazing family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Hug you
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Closer to U
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huang9999
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingemars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La wanniao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoyFly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S beehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODEM
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETASU
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castillo85684
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Versactton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lfjyeuoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Forder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRNAS
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTRME
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: changes242 somesdior33
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloryou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: karen mckinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWSTE
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby Amy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley K. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronchang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: etjtyif
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arreolas fashion tshirts 2016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia YIW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY MEYE LOCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poppy Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Input
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazierly moon 2016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FASTGCT
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYRONE MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enjoy U Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMJUK M30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pin Bo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: steciakcase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon R Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Bergin ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sHernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanpositar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHA PIT TMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIE MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONBR&INKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnnickelRajottey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Dallairek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suezengky Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenzo S.A.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?