Bickel v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Bickel and Scott T. Bickel
Defendant: Carter, Officer Jason Carter and City of Coral Springs
Case Number: 0:2017cv60606
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINAL JUDGMENT of Costs. Costs awarded to Coral Springs against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/5/2018. (ls)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #92 Verified Motion to Tax Costs.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/5/2018. (ls)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINAL ORDER of Dismissal re #96 Stipulation of Dismissal; Dismissing Case with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/1/2018. (ls)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jason Carter (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marrero, Oscar) Modified Text on 3/2/2018 (ls).
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Administratively Closing Case re #94 Notice of Settlement; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/5/2018. (ls) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Settlement by Scott T. Bickel (Grant, Gawane)
February 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: DEPOSITION by Scott T. Bickel. (Attachments: #1 Deposition MILLY LIMON'S DEPOSITION)(Grant, Gawane)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Tax Costs (Verified) by City of Coral Springs. Responses due by 2/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alexander, Scott)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER as to #87 MOTION in Limine . (Responses due by 2/2/2018) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/29/2018. (ls)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of City of Coral Springs against Scott T. Bickel. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/22/2018. (ls)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/19/2018. (ls)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying #63 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count IV. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/12/2018. (ls)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION in Limine by Jason Carter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wydler, Lourdes)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Scheduling Trial and ORDER of Instructions before Calendar Call, ( Calendar Call set for 2/13/2018 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Jury Trial set for 2/20/2018 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/18/2017. (ls)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #65 Motion in Limine by City of Coral Springs. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #82 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by City of Coral Springs. Replies due by 12/6/2017. (Alexander, Scott)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Scott T. Bickel. Responses due by 12/13/2017 (Grant, Gawane)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Grant, Gawane)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION in Limine filed by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion by 11/27/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Scott T. Bickel. (Grant, Gawane)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION in Limine filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 11/28/2017. (Grant, Gawane)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count IV) filed by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count IV) filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 11/27/2017. (Grant, Gawane)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Requiring Response as to #65 MOTION in Limine .( Responses due by 11/21/2017). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/16/2017. (ls)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by November 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSE by Scott T. Bickel. Responses due by 11/30/2017 (Grant, Gawane)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Requiring Response as to #63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count IV).( Responses due by 11/17/2017) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/14/2017. (ls)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by City of Coral Springs re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #68 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 1-G, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit 3) (Alexander, Scott) Modified Text on 11/13/2017 (ls).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Statement of: Concise Statement of Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by City of Coral Springs re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Alexander, Scott)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Coral Springs. Responses due by 11/24/2017 (Alexander, Scott)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gawane Constantine Grant on behalf of Scott T. Bickel. Attorney Gawane Constantine Grant added to party Scott T. Bickel(pty:pla). (Grant, Gawane)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION in Limine by City of Coral Springs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Alexander, Scott)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT by Charles N. Tetunic, Mediator. Disposition: No Agreement. (gp)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count IV) by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Scott T. Bickel re #61 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines OF SERVICE OF COURTS ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (Frankel, David)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David A. Frankel, Esq. filed by Scott T. Bickel, (Discovery due by 11/23/2017, Mediation Deadline 12/6/2017). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/4/2017. (lrz1)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David A. Frankel, Esq.. by Scott T. Bickel. Responses due by 10/18/2017 (Frankel, David)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Witness List (Expert) by City of Coral Springs.. (Alexander, Scott)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason Carter. (Marrero, Oscar)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #56 Motion for Medical Exam of Scott Bickel Pursuant to Rule 35, Fed.R.Civ.P. by City of Coral Springs. As agreed, the orthopedic examination shall take place by: Alan S. Routman, M.D.,5601 N. Dixie Highway, Suite 210 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334,Tel: (954) 776-4992, on October 16, 2017 at 12:45 p.m. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Medical Exam of Scott Bickel Pursuant to Rule 35, Fed.R.Civ.P. by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying #52 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/4/2017. (vmz)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Per DE #55 Jason Carter shall file an Answer to Count II of the Second AmendedComplaint due 8/11/2017. (vmz)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION to Dismiss #49 Amended Complaint Count II of Second Amended Complaint filed by Jason Carter. (Marrero, Oscar)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #52 MOTION to Dismiss #49 Amended Complaint Count II of Second Amended Complaint filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 7/24/2017. (Frankel, David)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss #49 Amended Complaint Count II of Second Amended Complaint by Jason Carter. Responses due by 7/17/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marrero, Oscar)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason Carter. (Marrero, Oscar)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Scott T. Bickel.(Frankel, David)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #46 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #43 Amended Complaint, #44 MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Scott T. Bickel. Responses due by 6/30/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frankel, David)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Coral Springs. Responses due by 6/28/2017 (Alexander, Scott)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Carter, City of Coral Springs filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Scott T. Bickel.(Frankel, David)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER STRIKING #41 Notice of Unavailability filed by Scott T. Bickel. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/6/2017. (mc)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (STRICKEN per DE #42 ) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Scott T. Bickel for dates of July 1, 2017 - July 16, 2017 (Frankel, David) Modified text on 6/6/2017 (mc).
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Carter's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ECF No. #35 , is GRANTED. The City's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of the Amended Complaint, ECF No. #20 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Count IV is DISMISSED with prejudice only insofar as it is based on the purported negligent infliction of emotional distress committed by Carter. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend and is direct to file a Second Amended Complaint on or before June 16, 2017. (Amended Complaint due by 6/16/2017). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/6/2017. (mc)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re #38 Reply to Response to Motion. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (mc)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint filed by Jason Carter. (Marrero, Oscar) Modified document link on 6/5/2017 (mc).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 6/6/2017. (Frankel, David)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason Carter. (Marrero, Oscar)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint by Jason Carter. Responses due by 6/8/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marrero, Oscar)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Count IV filed by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Count IV filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 5/30/2017. (Frankel, David)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Mediation. Mediation Hearing set for 10/26/2017 at 11:00 a.m.(mc)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Charles Tetunic. Mediation Hearing set for 10/26/2017 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/19/2017. (mc)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Charles Tetunic. Mediation Hearing set for 10/26/17 at 11:00 a.m.. (Frankel, David)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Charles Tetunic. (Frankel, David)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by 5/26/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Count IV by Scott T. Bickel. (Frankel, David)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Amended Complaint by May 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Jason Carter. Responses due by 5/30/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marrero, Oscar)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 2/20/2018 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/13/2018 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2017., Discovery due by 10/23/2017., Expert Discovery due by 10/23/2017., Joinder of Parties due by 7/3/2017., Mediation Deadline 11/6/2017., In Limine Motions due by 1/15/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2017., Motions due by 11/13/2017., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/15/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 11/6/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/3/2017. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jason Carter (Marrero, Oscar)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Scott T. Bickel (Frankel, David)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Coral Springs identifying Corporate Parent City of Coral Springs for City of Coral Springs (Alexander, Scott)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Count IV by City of Coral Springs. Responses due by 5/16/2017 (Alexander, Scott)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand to Count V by City of Coral Springs. (Alexander, Scott)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Parties by Scott T. Bickel (Frankel, David)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss based on the filing of an Amended Complaint, ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim based on the filing of an Amended Complaint, ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott T. Bickel.(Frankel, David)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Coral Springs. Attorney Scott David Alexander added to party City of Coral Springs(pty:dft). (Alexander, Scott)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Filed on Behalf of Defendant City of Coral Springs filed by Scott T. Bickel. Replies due by 5/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Frankel, David)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by Jason Carter. Responses due by 5/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marrero, Oscar)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lourdes Espino Wydler on behalf of Jason Carter. Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party Jason Carter(pty:dft). (Wydler, Lourdes)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oscar Edmund Marrero on behalf of Jason Carter. Attorney Oscar Edmund Marrero added to party Jason Carter(pty:dft). (Marrero, Oscar)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Coral Springs. Responses due by 4/26/2017 (Johnson, E.)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/11/2017. (mc)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Coral Springs. Attorney E. Bruce Johnson added to party City of Coral Springs(pty:dft). (Johnson, E.)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Scott T. Bickel. City of Coral Springs served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. (Frankel, David)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Scott T. Bickel. Jason Carter served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. (Frankel, David)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jason Carter and City of Coral Springs. (fbn)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (fbn)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom (fbn)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9598008, filed by Scott T. Bickel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Carter, Jason, #3 Summon(s) City of Coral Springs)(Frankel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickel v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jason Carter
Represented By: Lourdes Espino Wydler
Represented By: Oscar Edmund Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Coral Springs
Represented By: E. Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Scott David Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott T. Bickel
Represented By: Gawane Constantine Grant
Represented By: David Alan Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?