Garcia et al v. Dynamic International Airways, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Nixon Tineo, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Antonio Curcio, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Piergiogio Serloni, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Amato Tufano, Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Florines Medina De Milano, William Jose Montero Lazo, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Daniela Magro Garcia, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Henry Bucci Peluso, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Jonathan Benlolo, Paola Iani Ferrari, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Sharon Segal Sheero, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas and Ricardo Antonio Maldonado
Defendant: Captain Todd Thielbar, Kalitta Air, LLC and Dynamic International Airways, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Dina Mangiaracina De Scire, Carlos Bendayan, Domenico Scire and Laura Bendayan
Case Number: 0:2017cv61417
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dina Mangiaracina De Scire, Domenico Scire. Kalitta Air, LLC waiver sent on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. (Parks, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. (Thornton, Clayton)
November 14, 2018 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kalitta Air, LLC, filed by Dina Mangiaracina De Scire, Domenico Scire. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) to be issued by clerk)(Parks, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Dina Mangiaracina De Scire, Domenico Scire Notice of Filing Amended Pleading with Opposing Party's Written Consent (Parks, Robert)
September 18, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabriel A Garay on behalf of Dina Mangiaracina De Scire, Domenico Scire. Attorney Gabriel A Garay added to party Dina Mangiaracina De Scire(pty:conpla), Attorney Gabriel A Garay added to party Domenico Scire(pty:conpla). (Garay, Gabriel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L. Parks on behalf of Dina Mangiaracina De Scire, Domenico Scire. Attorney Robert L. Parks added to party Dina Mangiaracina De Scire(pty:conpla), Attorney Robert L. Parks added to party Domenico Scire(pty:conpla). (Parks, Robert)
September 17, 2018 Filing 40 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 39 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, #38 Notice (Other),,,,,,,,,,, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joseph P. Farina and Joseph P. Farina. (Silverio, Dayron)
September 13, 2018 Filing 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re #38 Notice (Other),,,,,,,,,,,. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (cbr)
September 13, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Florines Medina De Milano, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes of Selection of Mediator (Silverio, Dayron)
August 23, 2018 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kalitta Air, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connie Kalitta Holdings, Inc. for Kalitta Air, LLC (Maggio, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 36 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Kalitta Air, LLC. Attorney John Maggio added to party Kalitta Air, LLC(pty:dft). (Maggio, John)
August 2, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #31 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, to Extend Time to Select Mediator by Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Thornton, Clayton)
June 25, 2018 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Amato Tufano, Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, William Jose Montero Lazo, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Marianna Rojas Velasco, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Paola Iani Ferrari, Piergiogio Serloni, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Florines Medina De Milano, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Sharon Segal Sheero, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Kelly Garcia Colmenares, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Alberto Navarro Casuso, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Nixon Tineo, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Daniela Magro Garcia. Kalitta Air, LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Marks, Steven)
June 7, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. (Thornton, Clayton)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/5/2018. (kza)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 7/17/2020 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2019., Discovery due by 11/1/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/1/2018. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 4, 2018 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Kalitta Air, LLC. (mc)
June 1, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Florines Medina De Milano, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes re #28 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Piergiogio Serloni, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Nixon Tineo, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Henry Bucci Peluso, William Jose Montero Lazo, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Paola Iani Ferrari, Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, Daniela Magro Garcia, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Sharon Segal Sheero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Florines Medina De Milano, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Antonio Amato Tufano, Jonathan Benlolo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Antonio Curcio, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias (Marks, Steven)
May 25, 2018 Filing 28 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Amato Tufano, Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, William Jose Montero Lazo, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Marianna Rojas Velasco, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Paola Iani Ferrari, Piergiogio Serloni, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Florines Medina De Milano, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Sharon Segal Sheero, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Kelly Garcia Colmenares, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Alberto Navarro Casuso, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Nixon Tineo, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Daniela Magro Garcia.(Silverio, Dayron) Modified on 5/29/2018 (lh).
May 25, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Florines Medina De Milano, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes of Filing Amended Pleading with Opposing Party's Written Consent (Silverio, Dayron)
May 25, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Captain Todd Thielbar Without Prejudice by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Florines Medina De Milano, Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes (Silverio, Dayron)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The following three cases are hereby consolidated for all pretrial and discovery purposes: Case No. 17-61417-CIV-MARRA, Carlos Manuel Garcia, et al. v. Dynamic International Airways, LLC, et al.; Case No. 17-62332-CIV-MARRA, Domenico Scire et al. v. Dynamic International Airways, LLC, et al.; and Case No. 17-61536-CIV-MARRA, Carlos Bendayanet et al. v. Dynamic International Airways, LLC, et al. All pleadings and papers for these actions shall be filed in Case No. 17-61417-CIV-MARRA, Carlos Manuel Garcia, et al. v. Dynamic International Airways, LLC, et al., and shall henceforth bear Case No. 17-61417-CIV-MARRA. Case No. 17-62332 and Case No. 17-61536 are CLOSED for administrative purposes. Any documents filed in Case No. 17-62332 and Case No. 17-61536 in the future shall be automatically stricken. All pleadings and papers filed in Case No. 17-62332 and Case No. 17-61536 shall be deemed to be incorporated into Case No. 17-61417. The Clerk shall place a copy of this Order in Case No. 17-62332 and Case No. 17-61536, thereby indicating that the cases have been consolidated. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/17/2018. (mc)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Sever; denying #11 Motion for separate trials; granting #18 Motion to Correct Scrivener's Error in Case Style. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/17/2018. (ir)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Kevin Sutherland; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Kevin Moon; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Natasha Mikha. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/9/2018. (ir)
March 8, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Natasha N. Mikha. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10469775 by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. Responses due by 3/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Clayton)
March 8, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin O. Moon. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10469747 by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. Responses due by 3/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Clayton)
March 8, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin R. Sutherland. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10469693 by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. Responses due by 3/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Clayton)
February 21, 2018 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Clayton)
January 19, 2018 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Correct Scrivener's Error in Case Style by Fiorella Milano Medina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverio, Dayron)
December 15, 2017 Filing 17 REPLY to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,, by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. (Thornton, Clayton)
December 8, 2017 Filing 16 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Thornton, Clayton)
December 8, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Sever Claims, or in the Alternative MOTION for Separate Trials filed by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Fiorella Milano Medina, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes. Replies due by 12/15/2017. (Silverio, Dayron)
December 5, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayron Silverio on behalf of Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Fiorella Milano Medina, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes. Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Ernesto Rangel Amelii(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Carla Andreina Leon Barragan(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jonathan Benlolo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jonathan Benlolo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Alberto Navarro Casuso(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Kelly Garcia Colmenares(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Kelly Garcia Colmenares(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Antonio Curcio(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Antonio Curcio(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Elsa Calderon De Dovales(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Susana Levy De Gamerberg(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Rafael Ramon Dominguez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Paola Iani Ferrari(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jose Daniel Villarro Garay(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Carlos Manuel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Daniela Magro Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party David Francisco Magro Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Erick Jose Requena Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Alfredo Carabet Karabet(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jaime Gamerberg Kizer(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party William Jose Montero Lazo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party William Jose Montero Lazo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Ricardo Antonio Maldonado(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Martha Luica Rueda Marino(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Flor Mariamedina Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Fiorella Milano Medina(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Italia Campagna Oropeza(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Henry Bucci Peluso(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Ever Jose Dovales Rojas(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Edris Jesus Negron Rosal(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Antonio Scettri Sabello(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Piergiogio Serloni(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Sharon Segal Sheero(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Sharon Segal Sheero(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Sharon Segal Sheero(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Kasan Maklad Slahoub(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Nixon Tineo(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Antonio Amato Tufano(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Marianna Rojas Velasco(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Maria Corina Romero Viloria(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Maria Carolina Romero Viloria(pty:pla), Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes(pty:pla). (Silverio, Dayron)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #11 MOTION to Sever Claims, or in the Alternative MOTION for Separate Trials filed by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. Responses due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/1/2017. (ir)
November 30, 2017 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Motion to Sever Claims or, in the alternative, Motion for Separate Trials filed by the Defendant, Dynamic International Airways, LLC re #11 MOTION to Sever Claims, or in the Alternative MOTION for Separate Trials by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Fiorella Milano Medina, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes. Responses due by 12/14/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
November 17, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Sever Claims, or in the Alternative ( Responses due by 12/1/2017), MOTION for Separate Trials by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. (Thornton, Clayton)
November 17, 2017 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. (Thornton, Clayton)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REOPENING CASE AND LIFTING STAY, denying as moot #7 MOTION to lift stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(D). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/2/2017. (ir)
October 23, 2017 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Reopen Case and Lift Stay by Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Clayton)
September 14, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Reopen Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(D) by Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo, Ernesto Rangel Amelii, Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias, Carla Andreina Leon Barragan, Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra, Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Jonathan Benlolo(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol, Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon, Alberto Navarro Casuso, Kelly Garcia Colmenares(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Kelly Garcia Colmenares, Antonio Curcio, Antonio Curcio(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra, Elsa Calderon De Dovales, Susana Levy De Gamerberg, Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia, Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado, Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria, Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral, Rafael Ramon Dominguez, Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza, Paola Iani Ferrari, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco, Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of L.A.T.V., minor), Luis Rafael Turmero Franco(as natural parent of J.L.T.V., minor), Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo, Jose Daniel Villarro Garay, Carlos Manuel Garcia, Daniela Magro Garcia, David Francisco Magro Garcia, Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto, Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto(as natural parent of A.B.G.P., minor), Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia, Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez, Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez, Erick Jose Requena Herrera, Alfredo Carabet Karabet, Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi, Jaime Gamerberg Kizer, William Jose Montero Lazo, William Jose Montero Lazo(as natural parent of M.J.M.G., minor), Ricardo Antonio Maldonado, Martha Luica Rueda Marino, Flor Mariamedina Martinez, Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of A.M.M.C., minor), Loardo Javier Medina Martinez(as natural parent of V.E.M.C., minor), Fiorella Milano Medina, Italia Campagna Oropeza, Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza, Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega, Henry Bucci Peluso, Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff, Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero(as natural parent of A.S.C.B., minor), Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero, Ever Jose Dovales Rojas, Edris Jesus Negron Rosal, Antonio Scettri Sabello, Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum, Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue, Piergiogio Serloni, Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of L.B.S., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero(as natural parent of M.H.B., minor), Sharon Segal Sheero, Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta, Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio, Kasan Maklad Slahoub, Nixon Tineo, Antonio Amato Tufano, Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche, Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez, Marianna Rojas Velasco, Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini, Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba, Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria, Maria Corina Romero Viloria, Maria Carolina Romero Viloria, Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/31/2017. (ir) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
July 24, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Thornton, Clayton)
July 24, 2017 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Dynamic International Airways, LLC and Notice of Stay of Proceedings by Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case)(Thornton, Clayton)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/18/2017. (ir)
July 17, 2017 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rms1)
July 17, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9897183, filed by Dynamic International Airways, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A--state court file, #3 Exhibit B--Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court)(Thornton, Clayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Dynamic International Airways, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rafael Turmero Franco
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giulio Jose Spaziani Espinoza
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Calderon De Dovales
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Rangel Amelii
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Italia Campagna Oropeza
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nixon Tineo
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Fernanda Diaz Petkoff
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Garcia
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Curcio
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianna Rojas Velasco
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piergiogio Serloni
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Scettri Sabello
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Josefina Guerra Acevedo
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Luica Rueda Marino
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Navarro Casuso
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocio Del Valle Bello Useche
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessenia Kunbaz Kilzi
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Carabet Karabet
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edris Jesus Negron Rosal
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Amato Tufano
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Javier Ramirez Galindo
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Micaela Velasqu Guia
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Ignacio Gallego Guevara
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florines Medina De Milano
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jose Montero Lazo
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Adelso Gomez Silvio
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdy Del Carmen Came De Medina
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Josefina Sosa De Viloria
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Gamerberg Kizer
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Mercedes Pineda Arias
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Jose Requena Herrera
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Andreina Leon Barragan
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Maria Paez-Puma De Maldonado
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolaid Kasandra Orozco Del Corral
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Magro Garcia
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxana Dier Mesrop Salloum
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Levy De Gamerberg
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Garcia Colmenares
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carolina Romero Viloria
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwins Jose Colina Gutierrez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ramon Dominguez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Pestana Gomez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Daniel Villarro Garay
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Hernan Amigo Ortega
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Corina Romero Viloria
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fabiana Romero Viloria
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betina Virginia Zingg Velutini
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Bucci Peluso
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alberto Amigo Yanes
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Padilla Villalba
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Benlolo
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Iani Ferrari
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Maria Carpio Hernandez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Segal Sheero
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Miguel Ghinagli Gotto
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loardo Javier Medina Martinez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Mariamedina Martinez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Luisa Perez De Benzra
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Isis Bolivar Quintero
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vigma Josefina Palaci Santandrue
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasan Maklad Slahoub
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Francisco Magro Garcia
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rafael Campagna Oropeza
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rafael Tinoco Vasquez
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Antonieta Rauss De Garcia
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Marcel Rodrigue Becerra
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuliet Rocio Dovales Calderon
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jacques Benlolo Botbol
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carolina Yanes Sierralta
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ever Jose Dovales Rojas
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Antonio Maldonado
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Todd Thielbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalitta Air, LLC
Represented By: John Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic International Airways, LLC
Represented By: Kevin R. Sutherland
Represented By: Kevin O. Moon
Represented By: Joseph Thompson Thornton
Represented By: Natasha N. Mikha
Represented By: Clayton Wickliffe Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dina Mangiaracina De Scire
Represented By: Hernando Victor Pineres
Represented By: Russell Adam Dohan
Represented By: Gabriel A Garay
Represented By: Robert L. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Carlos Bendayan
Represented By: Alfonso J. Perez, Jr.
Represented By: Mac Samuel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Domenico Scire
Represented By: Hernando Victor Pineres
Represented By: Russell Adam Dohan
Represented By: Gabriel A Garay
Represented By: Robert L. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Laura Bendayan
Represented By: Alfonso J. Perez, Jr.
Represented By: Mac Samuel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?