Harris v. Jayo

Appellant: Kevin Harris
Appellee: James F. Jayo
Case Number: 0:2018cv61788
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 10 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/26/2018. (jc)
September 26, 2018 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/12/2018 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-60 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2018. (smd)
September 26, 2018 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/13/2018 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-9 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2018. (smd)
September 26, 2018 7 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Kevin Harris (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Designation - Appellant, #3 Designation - Appellee, #4 Exhibit Trial Exhibits)(smd)
August 16, 2018 6 Plaintiff's Statement by James F. Jayo (vmz)
August 13, 2018 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) James F. Jayo to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: jfjayo@yahoo.com (vmz)
August 2, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
August 2, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
August 2, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Kevin Harris (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
August 2, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-01421-RBR, filed by Kevin Harris.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Jayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kevin Harris
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James F. Jayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?