Fortune v. WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND FSB
Plaintiff: Marie Suzie Fortune
Defendant: Kass Schuler, Nation Star Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loans Management Services LLC, First Florida Funding Corp, GCTA 2013-NPL Depositor LLC, Broward County Sheriff Dept, U.S. Department of Housing and Development, Bank of America N.A., Broward Title Comp, Selene Finance, Quintairos Prieto, Wood & Boyer P.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. and WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND FSB
Case Number: 0:2018cv61917
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marie Suzie Fortune (Address updated) (mc)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Complaint, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Broward County Sheriff Dept. Attorney Terrence O'Byrne Lynch added to party Broward County Sheriff Dept(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, Terrence)
September 5, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nation Star Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub 1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc for Nation Star Mortgage LLC (Pasky, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel James Pasky on behalf of Nation Star Mortgage LLC. Attorney Daniel James Pasky added to party Nation Star Mortgage LLC(pty:dft). (Pasky, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of Nation Star Mortgage LLC. Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party Nation Star Mortgage LLC(pty:dft). (Rottmann, Emily)
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara F. Holladay-Tobias on behalf of Nation Star Mortgage LLC. Attorney Sara F. Holladay-Tobias added to party Nation Star Mortgage LLC(pty:dft). (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ariel Acevedo on behalf of Bank of America N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc.. Attorney Ariel Acevedo added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Ariel Acevedo added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc.(pty:dft). (Acevedo, Ariel)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND FSB. (mee)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Selene Finance. (mee)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Rushmore Loans Management Services LLC. (mee)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nation Star Mortgage LLC. (mee)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Broward County Sheriff Dept. (mee)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bank of America N.A.. (mee)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #5 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Stay, (cbr)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Sealed Order; denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law to Stay Execution of Eviction/Writ Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/16/2018 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000010800. (drz)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injuction and Memeorandum in Support to Stay Execution Of Eviction /Writ of Possession Pending Appeal by Marie Suzie Fortune. Responses due by 8/30/2018 (drz) Modified on 8/17/2018 (drz). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Stay on 8/17/2018 (cbr). Modified to unseal per DE #5 on 8/20/2018 (cbr).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Wrongful Foreclosure Damages, and for Declaratory Relief against Bank of America N.A., Broward County Sheriff Dept, Broward Title Comp, First Florida Funding Corp, GCTA 2013-NPL Depositor LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc., Nation Star Mortgage LLC, Quintairos Prieto, Wood & Boyer P.A., Rushmore Loans Management Services LLC, Kass Schuler, Selene Finance, U.S. Department of Housing and Development, WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND FSB. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS000010800, filed by Marie Suzie Fortune. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortune v. WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kass Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Star Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Sara F. Holladay-Tobias
Represented By: Daniel James Pasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loans Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Florida Funding Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCTA 2013-NPL Depositor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward County Sheriff Dept
Represented By: Terrence O'Byrne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Ariel Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward Title Comp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintairos Prieto, Wood & Boyer P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc.
Represented By: Ariel Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Suzie Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?