ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv61934
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 Initial Disclosure(s) by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bedard, Benjamin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 Initial Disclosure(s) of Initial Disclosures Rule 26(a)(1) by ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest (Stevens, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest. Mediation Hearing set for 12/17/2018 AT 1:00 P.M.. (Stevens, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Bedard, Benjamin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest (Stevens, Michael)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 10/7/2019 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 10/4/2019 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest re #5 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Proposed Order (Stevens, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest (Stevens, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Bedard, Benjamin)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lbc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10917803, filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bedard, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Bedard
Represented By: Shelli A. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?