Moffa & Breuer, PLLC v. Kapila et al
Appellant: Moffa & Breuer, PLLC
Appellee: Spiro Marchelos, Soneet R. Kapila and U.S. Trustee Daniel M McDermott
Case Number: 0:2018cv62095
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 APPENDIX to #14 Appellant's Brief by Moffa & Breuer, PLLC (Breuer, Stephen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 Appellant's BRIEF by Moffa & Breuer, PLLC. (Breuer, Stephen)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Philip Pugatch on behalf of Soneet R. Kapila (Pugatch, Chad)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill Ellen Kelso on behalf of Daniel M McDermott. Attorney Jill Ellen Kelso added to party Daniel M McDermott(pty:e). (Kelso, Jill)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robin J. Rubens on behalf of Spiro Marchelos. Attorney Robin J. Rubens added to party Spiro Marchelos(pty:e). (Rubens, Robin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/22/2018. (jc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/31/2018 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-54 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2018. (smd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/31/2018 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (smd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/31/2018 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-61 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018. (smd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/30/2018 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-28 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2018. (smd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Moffa & Breuer, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Designation -Appellant, #3 Designation - Appellees(Kapila and Marchelos), #4 Designation - Appellee(UST))(smd)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Moffa & Breuer, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-22819-RBR, filed by Moffa & Breuer, PLLC.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffa & Breuer, PLLC v. Kapila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Moffa & Breuer, PLLC
Represented By: John A. Moffa
Represented By: Stephen Charles Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Spiro Marchelos
Represented By: Thomas Ralph Lehman
Represented By: Glenn Jerrold Waldman
Represented By: Robin J. Rubens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Soneet R. Kapila
Represented By: Chad Philip Pugatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee Daniel M McDermott
Represented By: Jill Ellen Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?