USA v. $56,018.00
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $56,018.00
Case Number: 0:2018cv62195
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to $56,018.00. (pes)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Warrant In Rem Issued as to $56,018.00. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $56,018.00 In United States Currency Seized from Armando Smith De La Rosa on or About October 1, 2008. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS44, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Grove, Daren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $56,018.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Daren Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $56,018.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?