United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Case Number: 0:2018cv62207
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:0270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #21 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the mediator. (mc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc.. (Young, Daniel)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018. Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Expert Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018. All motions including summary judgment motions, motions related to summary judgment motions, Daubert motions and motions related to trial evidence due by 4/19/2019. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/3/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 6/5/2019 at 1:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America (Graham, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. (Young, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Young, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Attorney Robert Craig Graham, Jr added to party Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America(pty:dft). (Graham, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Reset Answer Due Deadline per DE #14 Order: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America response due 10/25/2018. (ar2)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OMNIBUS ORDER denying #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying #12 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Planning and Scheduling Report. Defendant Shall Respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint, by October 25, 2018. (Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 10/26/2018). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plainiff's Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Planning and Scheduling Report and to Reschedule Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference re #8 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Divers, Brett)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Attorney Brett Devereux Divers added to party Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/6/2018 (Divers, Brett) Modified Relief on 10/23/2018 (ls).
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. re #9 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Amended Complaint, (Young, Daniel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc.. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Young, Daniel)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Joint Planning Scheduling Report due by 10/26/2018). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (cbr)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. re #5 Amended Complaint, filed by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. (Young, Daniel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Miller Act Bond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Work Authorization Form)(Young, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case - Civil Cover Shee (Young, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cbr)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11004893, filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Young, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Robert Craig Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Devereux Divers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States f/u/b/o Ceres Enviromental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Te Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?