Philpot v. Rockfile Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Rockfile Media, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv62330
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 Clerks Entry of Default as to Rockfile Media, LLC - Motions Terminated: #14 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/19/2018. (lk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Larry G. Philpot re #14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Rockfile Media, LLC, #13 Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Motion for entry with exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Parwani, Rinky)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Rockfile Media, LLC by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parwani, Rinky)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Returned)(Parwani, Rinky)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Rockfile Media, LLC - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Answer deadline has NOT lapsed. Answer deadline: 11/13/18. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/6/2018. (lk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (lk)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES: Rockfile Media, LLC Answer due 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Larry G. Philpot re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment Proposed order (Parwani, Rinky)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerk's entry of Default by Larry G. Philpot. (Parwani, Rinky) Modified relief and text on 11/6/2018 (lk).
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Larry G. Philpot. (Parwani, Rinky)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Larry G. Philpot. Rockfile Media, LLC served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Parwani, Rinky)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #4 Summons Issued. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rockfile Media, LLC. (pes)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (pes)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rockfile Media, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11036511, payment transferred from : 18CV62328, filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Summon(s) Summons)(Parwani, Rinky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Rockfile Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Rinky S. Parwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockfile Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?