Resmini v. Touris et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Resmini, Ltd. Law Offices and Ronald J. Resmini
Defendant: PPLS, Inc. and Nicholas P Touris
Case Number: 0:2018cv62352
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 Dismissal STIPULATION by PPLS, Inc., Ronald J. Resmini, Ronald J. Resmini, Ltd. Law Offices, Nicholas P Touris. (kpe)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. Any scheduled hearings are CANCELED, all pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties are due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe) Modified on 10/25/2018 (kpe).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. (Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties are due by 10/24/2018). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Andre S. Digou, mailing date October 3, 2018, (pt)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ronald J. Resmini, mailing date October 3, 2018, (pt)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 Case transferred in from Rhode Island; Case Number 1:18-cv-00383. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss and/or transfer the case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/3/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Resmini, Ronald)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time ; Reset Deadlines: Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss due by 9/21/2018.- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/7/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for an Extension of Time 20 day extension to answer MTD or Transfer filed by Ronald J. Resmini. Responses due by 9/14/2018. (Resmini, Ronald)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Nicholas P. Touris, #2 Exhibit 2. Sales Agreement)(Digou, Andre)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre S. Digou on behalf of All Defendants (Digou, Andre)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald J. Resmini. PPLS, Inc. served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Resmini, Ronald)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald J. Resmini. Nicholas P Touris served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Resmini, Ronald)
July 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PPLS, Inc., Nicholas P Touris. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
July 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Ronald J. Resmini. (Resmini, Ronald)
July 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Ronald J. Resmini. (Resmini, Ronald)
July 11, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 11, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1235161 ), filed by Ronald R Resmini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Resmini, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resmini v. Touris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Resmini, Ltd. Law Offices
Represented By: Ronald J. Resmini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Resmini
Represented By: Ronald J. Resmini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPLS, Inc.
Represented By: Andre S. Digou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas P Touris
Represented By: Andre S. Digou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?