Jean-Jacques et al v. The Bank of New York

Plaintiff: Stephen Jean-Jacques and Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques
Defendant: The Bank of New York and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 0:2018cv62464
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York Mellon For The Truth in Lending Act Violation and Fraud, filed by Stephen Jean-Jacques, Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques.(drz)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Complaint ECF No. #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs have until November 7, 2018 to file an amended complaint. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ECF No. #2 is DENIED without prejudice. (Amended Complaint due by 11/7/2018). Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques, Stephen Jean-Jacques. (lk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Stephen Jean-Jacques, Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean-Jacques et al v. The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Gerta Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?