Minor v. Israel et al
Plaintiff: Travis Minor
Defendant: Deputy Yanessa Ayra, Deputy Taryn Martin and Officer Scott Israel
Case Number: 0:2018cv62585
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint #12 . Moreover, the parties shall comply with this Court's Order requiring a joint scheduling report and proposed order #4 on or before January 3, 2019. If no Joint Scheduling Report is filed, this case shall immediately be dismissed without prejudice without any further warning. If a Defendant is not cooperating with Plaintiff in the filing of the Joint Scheduling Report, Plaintiff may file a Notice of Non-Cooperation by the above deadline and a default final judgment may be entered against such Defendant. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/21/2018. (ean) Corrected year re: due date to 2019 on 12/21/2018 per chambers (mf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Travis Minor.(Morgan, Jack)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/17/2018. (ean)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Motion to Dismiss re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Travis Minor. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Morgan, Jack)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Yanessa Ayra, Scott Israel, Taryn Martin. Attorney Robert Dominic Yates added to party Taryn Martin(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Yates, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Travis Minor. Yanessa Ayra served on 11/8/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Morgan, Jack)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 3, 2018. Moreover, the parties are instructed to timely comply with this Court's Order requiring a joint scheduling report and proposed order #4 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/21/2018. (ean)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by Yanessa Ayra, Scott Israel. Attorney Robert Dominic Yates added to party Yanessa Ayra(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Dominic Yates added to party Scott Israel(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yates, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Travis Minor. Scott Israel served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Morgan, Jack)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Yanessa Ayra, Scott Israel, Taryn Martin. (jao)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11110730, filed by Travis Minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Morgan, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor v. Israel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Yanessa Ayra
Represented By: Robert Dominic Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Taryn Martin
Represented By: Robert Dominic Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Scott Israel
Represented By: Robert Dominic Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Minor
Represented By: Jack Clyde Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?