Bethesda Health, Inc. et al v. Azar
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District, Bethesda Health, Inc., The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida, Sarasota Memorial Hospital and Naples Community Hospital, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 0:2018cv63021
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida, South Broward Hospital District. Alex M Azar, II served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Taylor, J.)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. See attached document for full details. The parties are to carefully review this Order in that it modifies page limitations, time periods for responding to motions, discovery deadlines, conferral requirements, proper objections to discovery and other discovery procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/21/2018. (sl00)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark Polston, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/21/2018. (sl00)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Polston. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11234843 by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District, The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mark D. Polston, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, J.)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District, The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida (Taylor, J.)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, United States Attorney General Department of Justice, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Florida. (amb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11230636, filed by Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida, South Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) for HHS Secretary, #4 Summon(s) for U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summon(s) for U.S. Attorney)(Taylor, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethesda Health, Inc. et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Broward Hospital District
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethesda Health, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, Florida
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarasota Memorial Hospital
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naples Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?