Simione v. LIBMAN et al

Plaintiff: Jason Simione
Defendant: RICKY LIBMAN, LUIS RIVERA, DANA HEINSEN, DONNA LEE PEPLIN and MEGUMI HAGA
Case Number: 0:2018cv63037
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1443cv
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LUIS RIVERA. (Stearns, Christopher)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Jason Simione OF AMENDMENT BY INTERLINEATION OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT (Gibson, Joseph)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT filed by Jason Simione. Replies due by 2/8/2019. (Gibson, Joseph)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion on or before February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/2/2019. (isc)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Jason Simione of Pretermitted Parties (Gibson, Joseph)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jason Simione. (Gibson, Joseph)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has failed to fully comply with S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). Counsel shall identify with specificity the reasonable efforts to confer (including the date, time, and manner of each effort). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/28/2018. (isc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jason Simione. Responses due by 1/11/2019 (Gibson, Joseph)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LUIS RIVERA. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Stearns, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/13/2018. (isc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ross Piper on behalf of RICKY LIBMAN, LUIS RIVERA. Attorney Michael Ross Piper added to party RICKY LIBMAN(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ross Piper added to party LUIS RIVERA(pty:dft). (Piper, Michael)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint)defendant's motion to dismiss filed, Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11235910, filed by LUIS RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(Stearns, Christopher)Text Modified on 12/13/2018 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simione v. LIBMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY LIBMAN
Represented By: Michael Ross Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS RIVERA
Represented By: Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Ross Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA HEINSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA LEE PEPLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGUMI HAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Simione
Represented By: Joseph W. Gibson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?