Holmseth v. Picazio et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Charles Holmseth
Defendant: Kim Lowry Picazio, William K. Murtaugh, Karen Denise Gaur and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 0:2019cv60002
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Compliance re #28 Order. (kpe)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT, ( Status Report due by 1/14/2019.) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Warren David Harless and David Brendan Lacy, mailing date January 2, 2019, (pt)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven Scott Biss, mailing date January 2, 2019, (pt)
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 Case transferred in from Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00361. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
December 27, 2018 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida - Ft. Lauderdale Division. (jsmi, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the Court finds that the relevant factors favor transfer to the Southern District of Florida, Fort Lauderdale Division. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Picazio's #15 motion to transfer venue. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (jsmi, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 AFFIDAVITS of Service for complaint served on defendants Kim Picazio and William Murtaugh, filed by Timothy Charles Holmseth - affidavits reflect service by posting as to each defendant. [Received by Clerk's Office after phone call to pltf's counsel regarding service on Murtaugh, counsel stated his files show these were mailed to Clerk's Office on September 11] (wtuc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 21 Rebuttal Brief re #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Lacy, David)
November 6, 2018 Filing 20 Rebuttal Brief re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lacy, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Holmseth)(Biss, Steven)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that on #17 motion of Plaintiff, Timothy Charles Holmseth, for an extension of time to file his memorandum in opposition to defendant, Kim Lowry Picazio's, motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion to transfer venue (ECF Nos. #13 , #15 ), and upon consideration of the arguments set forth in Plaintiff's motion and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the deadline for filing Plaintiff's response to Defendant Picazio's motions is hereby extended as follows: (a) Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before October 31, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/19/2018. (walk, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #15 MOTION to Change Venue by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Biss, Steven)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Lacy, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Lacy, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - restraining order, #2 Exhibit B - writ of bodily attachment, #3 Exhibit C - amended writ of bodily attachment, #4 Exhibit D - affidavit)(Lacy, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Lacy, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren David Harless on behalf of Kim Lowry Picazio (Harless, Warren)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. Ms. Picazio shall file her response, including any applicable defenses under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b), to the Complaint on or before October 5, 2018. To avoid any uncertainty, Ms. Picazio docs not waive and has not waived any applicable defenses under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) or objections to venue, if any, by seeking the relief granted herein. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/12/2018. (jsmi, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Respond To Complaint by Kim Lowry Picazio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacy, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brendan Lacy on behalf of Kim Lowry Picazio (Lacy, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service And Mailing of Statutory Notice to Defendant, Kim Lowry Picazio by Steven Scott Biss on behalf of Timothy Charles Holmseth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Biss, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Karen Denise Gaur served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (jsmi, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Karen Denise Gaur, William K. Murtaugh, and Kim Lowry Picazio. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Biss, Steven)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Defendant Gaur) by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Biss, Steven)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Defendant Murtaugh) by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Biss, Steven)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Defendant Picazio) by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Biss, Steven)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6103680), filed by Timothy Charles Holmseth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmseth v. Picazio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Lowry Picazio
Represented By: Warren David Harless
Represented By: David Brendan Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K. Murtaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Denise Gaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Charles Holmseth
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?