Natasha Paracha v. General Mills, Inc.

Plaintiff: Natasha Paracha and Morgan Steckler
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60063
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to #50 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. This cause is dismissed with prejudice as to Plaintiff's individual claims. This case shall be administratively closed and any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal by General Mills, Inc. (Puentes, Angela)
January 10, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angela Teresa Puentes on behalf of General Mills, Inc.. Attorney Angela Teresa Puentes added to party General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft). (Puentes, Angela)
January 8, 2019 Filing 48 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Charles C Sipos and Mica D Klein, mailing date January 8, 2019, (pt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 47 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David T Biderman and Steven Kichong Hwang, mailing date January 8, 2019, (pt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 46 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Stewart M Weltman, mailing date January 8, 2019, (pt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 45 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Carrie A Laliberte and Elaine A Ryan, mailing date January 8, 2019, (pt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 44 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Patricia N Syverson and Manfred Patrick Muecke, mailing date January 8, 2019, (pt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 43 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jordanna G Thigpen, mailing date January 8, 2019, (pt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 42 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 41 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07659. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA #35 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant's motion to transfer this case to the Southern District of Florida is GRANTED. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
December 31, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida #35 filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Biderman, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 38 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida #35 filed by Plaintiffs Natasha Paracha, Morgan Steckler. (Syverson, Patricia)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Class Certification Motion [L.R. 23-3] #36 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (See document for further information). (jp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Syverson, Patricia)
November 19, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration of Charles C. Sipos re Motion to Transfer, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (Biderman, David)
October 24, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha, identifying N/A. (Syverson, Patricia)
October 24, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First Amended Complaint #31 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. However, counsel must consult the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #32 and file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than **October 25, 2018.** Failure to do so may result in the First Amended Complaint being STRICKEN. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 19, 2018 Filing 31 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant General Mills, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Syverson, Patricia)
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to General Mills, Inc. answer now due 11/19/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc..(Biderman, David)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Mica D. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc, designating Steven K. Hwang as local counsel #26 . (iv)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Charles C. Sipos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc, designating Steven K. Hwang as local counsel #25 . (iv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 27 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc., (Biderman, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mica D. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/2/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22518003) filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Hwang, Steven)
October 9, 2018 Filing 25 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles C. Sipos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/2/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22517829) filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Hwang, Steven)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Paracha, designating Jordanna G Thigpen as local counsel. (jp)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Paracha (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22536688) filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thigpen, Jordanna)
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles C. Sipos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22517829) #19 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mica D. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22518003) #20 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 10/11/18. Counsel shall carefully consult the error(s) noted in the Notices of Deficiencies #21 and re-file no later than 10/11/18. (twdb)
October 4, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles C. Sipos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22517829) #19 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mica D. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22518003) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Counsel left blank the section of each proposed order in which local counsel's contact information must be provided. (twdb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER #22] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mica D. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22518003) filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear) (Attorney Mica D Klein added to party General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Klein, Mica) Modified on 10/5/2018 (twdb).
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER #22] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles C. Sipos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Mills, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22517829) filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear) (Attorney Charles C Sipos added to party General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Sipos, Charles) Modified on 10/5/2018 (twdb).
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 (INCORRECTLY FILED AS APPLICATION for Leave of Steven K. Hwang to Appear) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO ATTORNEY STEVEN K. HWANG filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Attorney Steven Kichong Hwang added to party General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Hwang, Steven) Modified on 10/3/2018 (mku).
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 (INCORRECTLY FILED AS APPLICATION for Leave of David T. Biderman to Appear) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO ATTORNEY DAVID T. BIDERMAN filed by Defendant General Mills, Inc.. (Attorney David T Biderman added to party General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Biderman, David) Modified on 10/3/2018 (mku).
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 upon General Mills, Inc. served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/19/2018, served by Process server service, by Federal statute, upon Alberto Damonte, Service of Process Intake Clerk. (Syverson, Patricia)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Stewert M. Weltman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaingiff Natasha Paracha, designating Jordanna G. Thigpen as local counsel. (es)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney Carrie Ann Laliberte APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Paracha, designating Jordanna G. Thigpen as local counsel. (es)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Paracha (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22481583) filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thigpen, Jordanna)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jordanna G Thigpen on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Paracha (Thigpen, Jordanna)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stewart M. Weltman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Paracha (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22476041) filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jordanna G Thigpen added to party Natasha Paracha(pty:pla)) (Thigpen, Jordanna)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849.The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses.Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant General Mills, Inc. (lh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Syverson, Patricia)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha, identifying NA. (Syverson, Patricia)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Syverson, Patricia)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22355419 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Patricia N Syverson added to party Natasha Paracha(pty:pla))(Syverson, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natasha Paracha v. General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Paracha
Represented By: Carrie A. Laliberte
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Jordanna G. Thigpen
Represented By: Stewart Weltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Steckler
Represented By: Carrie A. Laliberte
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Charles C. Sipos
Represented By: Mica D. Klein
Represented By: Steven Kichong Hwang
Represented By: Angela Teresa Puentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?