Axelrod v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Axelrod
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60131
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in District of Maryland as case 8:19-cv-00516, filed 02/22/2019. (bb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of Maryland re: MDL 2879 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Paul W. Grimm. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (vjk)
February 22, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 0:19-cv-60131 electronically transferred out to Maryland. (vjk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of Maryland re: MDL 2879 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Paul W. Grimm. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 13 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Lisa Axelrod. Marriott International, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019; Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. SEE DE #12 (ail)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Lisa Axelrod of Filing Affidavits of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marriott International, Inc., #2 Exhibit Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC) (Shaw-Wilder, Detra)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion Unopposed MOTION for entry of Stipulated Order Suspending Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (With Supporting Memorandum of Law). Status Report due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for entry of Stipulated Order Suspending Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (With Supporting Memorandum of Law) by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mars Merger Sub, LLC for Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin William Shaughnessy on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. Attorney Kevin William Shaughnessy added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin William Shaughnessy added to party Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft). (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas E. Loeser. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas E. Loeser. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11321063 by Lisa Axelrod. Responses due by 1/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw-Wilder, Detra)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ail)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Lisa Axelrod re #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Axelrod (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Marriott International, Inc., #2 Summon(s) Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC) (Shaw-Wilder, Detra)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11315245, filed by Lisa Axelrod. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw-Wilder, Detra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axelrod v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin William Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Kevin William Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Axelrod
Represented By: Detra Shaw-Wilder
Represented By: Thomas E. Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?