Stockfood America, Inc. v. Peto et al

Plaintiff: Stockfood America, Inc.
Defendant: Andrasne Peto, Forever Living.com, L.L.C. and Susan Peto
Case Number: 0:2019cv60187
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Forever Living.com, L.L.C.. Responses due by 3/26/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stockfood America, Inc.. Attorney Ana Paula Moretto added to party Stockfood America, Inc.(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moretto, Ana)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stockfood America, Inc.. Andrasne Peto served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Forever Living.com, L.L.C.. Responses due by 3/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Sacher, Joseph)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Forever Living.com, L.L.C.. Answer due 3/5/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Stockfood America, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/21/2019. (vty)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Forever Living.com, L.L.C.. Attorney Joseph Alan Sacher added to party Forever Living.com, L.L.C.(pty:dft). (Sacher, Joseph)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Stockfood America, Inc.. Forever Living.com, L.L.C. served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (original mailed) (mee)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Forever Living.com, L.L.C., Andrasne Peto. (mee)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Forever Living.com, L.L.C., Andrasne Peto. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11328759, filed by Stockfood America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockfood America, Inc. v. Peto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrasne Peto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Living.com, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph Alan Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Peto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockfood America, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?