Brown v. Air Line Piots Asssociation
Plaintiff: Daryl Brown
Defendant: Air Line Piots Asssociation
Case Number: 0:2019cv60242
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:0151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by Air Line Piots Asssociation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gornail, Christina)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Air Line Piots Asssociation (Gornail, Christina)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Line Piots Asssociation (Gornail, Christina)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Air Line Piots Asssociation. (Gornail, Christina)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's #6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Daryl Brown. Replies due by 3/20/2019. (kpe)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Air Line Piots Asssociation served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (kpe)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before March 22, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 , #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. James K. Lobsenz and Thomas N. Ciantra are permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant Air Line Pilots Association for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Messrs. Lobsenz and Ciantra at jim.lobsenz@alpa.org and Thomas.ciantra@alpa.org. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James K. Lobsenz. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11434836 by Air Line Piots Asssociation. Responses due by 3/14/2019 (Gornail, Christina)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas N. Ciantra. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11434811 by Air Line Piots Asssociation. Responses due by 3/14/2019 (Gornail, Christina)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Air Line Piots Asssociation. Attorney Christina Sabine Gornail added to party Air Line Piots Asssociation(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gornail, Christina)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Air Line Piots Asssociation. (lk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Daryl Brown to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: plane_qualified@hotmail.com (lk) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/29/2019) (lk).
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Line Piots Asssociation. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Daryl Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Air Line Piots Asssociation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Line Piots Asssociation
Represented By: Christina Sabine Gornail
Represented By: Thomas N. Ciantra
Represented By: James K. Lobsenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?