Cohan v. RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.

Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60290
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL. Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2019. Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2019. All motions including summary judgment motions, motions related to summary judgment motions, Daubert motions and motions related to trial evidence due by 8/16/2019. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 10/30/2019 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Cohan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feinstein, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howard Cohan (Feinstein, Mark)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant RI/Hollywood Nissan Acquisition Corp. d/b/a AutoNation Nissan Pembroke Pines Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.. Attorney Jeffrey Alan Blaker added to party RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.(pty:dft). (Blaker, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2019 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 3/8/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Howard Cohan. RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP. served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Feinstein, Mark)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.. (cds)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11361412, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Feinstein, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Alexandria Rae Feinstein
Represented By: Mark David Feinstein
Represented By: Neil Steven Odessky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI/HOLLYWOOD NISSAN ACQUISITION CORP.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?