KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02
Plaintiff: KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02
Case Number: 0:2019cv60307
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Barry Yanofsky on behalf of KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.. Attorney Stuart Barry Yanofsky added to party KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.(pty:pla). (Yanofsky, Stuart)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,,, to Compel Arbitration filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02. (Betar, Patrick)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,,, to Compel Arbitration filed by KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.. Replies due by 3/1/2019. (Hall, Karma)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karma D. Hall on behalf of KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.. Attorney Karma D. Hall added to party KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.(pty:pla). (Hall, Karma)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,,, to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Omnibus Order (Y-Tech 180 Units Miami Beach v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London), #2 Exhibit B- Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation (Feuer Family v. Certain Underwriters et. al.), #3 Exhibit C - Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Order Dismissing Case (165th Street LLC v. Underwriters at Lloyd's London)) (Berk, William)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02 (Betar, Patrick)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,,, to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Berk, William)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11367034, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Notice of Serving First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Notice of Designaion of E-Mail Addresses, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions to Defendant, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendants, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons Issued, #9 Exhibit 9 - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons Returned Served, #11 Exhibit 11 - Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, #12 Exhibit 12 - Defendants' Email Designation Pursuant to Florida Rule of Judicial Administration 2.516, #13 Exhibit 13 - Defendants' Notice of Appearance, #14 Exhibit 14 - Defendants' Second Motion for Enlargement of Time, #15 Exhibit 15 - Agreed Order on Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Discovery, #16 Civil Cover Sheet 16 - Federal Civil Cover Sheet)(Berk, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KDH Architecture Inc. A/A/O Reagan Investments, L.P.
Represented By: Faith D. Everett
Represented By: Karma D. Hall
Represented By: Stuart Barry Yanofsky
Represented By: Kimesha Shannese Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number AMR-1600-02
Represented By: William S. Berk
Represented By: Alan Henry Swindoll
Represented By: Patrick Edward Betar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?