Perry v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Lawrence Henry Perry
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv60324
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2255 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this motion should not be granted and shall file therewith all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of this motion regardless of whether or not they are in the Court file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER re 3 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Lawrence Henry Perry is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/13/2019. (adc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File A Memorandum of Law in Support for Each Claim Raised Herein by Lawrence Henry Perry. See DE [1-1] for image. (kpe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (kpe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 18-cr-60006-FAM), filed by Lawrence Henry Perry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Henry Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?