Montoya v. Upstate Management Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Mario Montoya
Defendant: Upstate Management Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60354
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
1 Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Upstate Management Services, LLC (Golden, Dale)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Upstate Management Services, LLC (Golden, Dale)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Upstate Management Services, LLC. Attorney Dale Thomas Golden added to party Upstate Management Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Golden, Dale)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Mario Montoya. Upstate Management Services, LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Owens, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Upstate Management Services, LLC. (drz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Upstate Management Services, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11381119, filed by Mario Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Owens, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. Upstate Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Montoya
Represented By: Scott David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upstate Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Dale Thomas Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?