Robinson v. Raticoff

Plaintiff: John B. Robinson
Defendant: Esq. Bruce Raticoff
Case Number: 0:2019cv60355
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Jose E Martinez
1 Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 3/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John B. Robinson Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 2/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 02/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John B. Robinson. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under the Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Bruce Raticoff. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by John B. Robinson.(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Raticoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Bruce Raticoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?