Palermo v. World Rainbow Painting & Restoration, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas R. Palermo
Defendant: World Rainbow, Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Environ Towers II Condominium Association, Inc., Environ Condominium II Association, Inc. and World Rainbow Painting & Restoration, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60360
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #6 Transmittal Letter Sent (lk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #6 Transmittal Letter Sent (lk)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Reconsider Remand Order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Fay)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order to: 17th Judicial Circuit in and for Broward County, FL. State Court Case Number: CACE-18-015569-08 (ar2)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in and for Broward, Florida. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Memorandum of Law by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Fay)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nicholas R. Palermo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucker, Matthew)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11382021, filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Ryan, Fay) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (ar2). (State Court Answer filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palermo v. World Rainbow Painting & Restoration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Rainbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Fay E. Ryan
Represented By: Ryan Kent Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environ Towers II Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environ Condominium II Association, Inc.
Represented By: Niva Maria Harney
Represented By: Andrew Jon Palma
Represented By: Jami Lee Steinacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Rainbow Painting & Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Peter Scott Baumberger
Represented By: Michael F Suarez
Represented By: Michelle Karinne Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas R. Palermo
Represented By: Matthew Sean Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?