Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Environ Condominium II Association, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Defendant: Environ Towers II Condominium Association, Inc., Nicholas R. Palermo and Environ Condominium II Association, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60361
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Patrick M Hunt
1 Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Notice of Dismissal or Stipulation of Dismissal by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Hilton, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Administratively Closing Case Upon Notice Of Settlement. The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Any party may move to reopen the action if there is a problem in reaching a final settlement agreement. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement Pending by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Ryan, Fay)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/21/2019. (sl00)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Environ Condominium II Association, Inc., Nicholas R. Palermo, filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hilton, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Amended Complaint. ( Amended Complaint due by 2/21/2019). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Environ Condominium II Association, Inc., Nicholas R. Palermo. (amb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Environ Condominium II Association, Inc., Nicholas R. Palermo. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11382179, filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to Nicholas Palermo, #3 Summon(s) to Environ Condominium II Association, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(Ryan, Fay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Environ Condominium II Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Fay E. Ryan
Represented By: Ryan Kent Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environ Towers II Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas R. Palermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environ Condominium II Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?