Everest Indemnity Insurance Company v. Cintas Corporation No. 2
Plaintiff: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Shorty
Defendant: Cintas Corporation No. 2
Case Number: 0:2019cv60405
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cintas Corporation No. 2. (Burns, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. Replies due by 3/22/2019. (Dennen, Cynthia)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (Dennen, Cynthia)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Removal by Cintas Corporation No. 2 (Burns, Ryan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cintas Corporation No. 2. Responses due by 3/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11395163, filed by Cintas Corporation No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Court, #2 Exhibit "A" to Petition for Removal, #3 Exhibit "B" to Peition for Removal, #4 Appendix State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Appendix State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Appendix State Court Summons, #7 Appendix State Court Complaint, #8 Appendix State Court Notice of Appearance)(Burns, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company v. Cintas Corporation No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Cynthia Moore Dennen
Represented By: Robert B. Birthisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shorty
Represented By: Cynthia Moore Dennen
Represented By: Robert B. Birthisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation No. 2
Represented By: Ryan D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?