Broward County, Florida v. Airbnb, Inc.
Plaintiff: Broward County and Broward County, Florida
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc. and John Doe Nos. 1-99
Case Number: 0:2019cv60422
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Levenberg Terwilleger, Amy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Broward County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Buchanan Complaint)(Harrod, Rene)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Broward County, Florida. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alachua trial court opinion)(Harrod, Rene)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order to Show Cause by Airbnb, Inc.. (Levenberg Terwilleger, Amy)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order to Show Cause by Broward County, Florida. (Harrod, Rene)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Airbnb, Inc.. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Levenberg Terwilleger, Amy)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice of Action/Publication. - Notice of Action/Publication was not issued. Order by a judge is required. (kpe)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Action/Publication filed by Broward County, Florida. (Harrod, Rene)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Randall Luechauer. re #5 Amended Complaint Affidavit Supporting Constructive Service of Process by Publication by Broward County, Florida (Harrod, Rene)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Airbnb, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levenberg Terwilleger, Amy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Broward County, Florida. (Harrod, Rene)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Motion #7 is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to file a motion that complies with the requirements of S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1.A.3., which requires the moving party to certify that it has conferred, or describes a reasonable effort to confer, with the parties affected in a good faith effort to resolve the dispute. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 03/15/2019. (mkz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Broward County, Florida. (Harrod, Rene)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING AS #4 MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Airbnb, Inc., John Doe Nos. 1-99, filed by Broward County, Florida.(Harrod, Rene)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Airbnb, Inc.. Responses due by 3/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Levenberg Terwilleger, Amy)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTAND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11400552, filed by Airbnb, Inc.. No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal)(Levenberg Terwilleger, Amy) Modified on 2/19/2019 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broward County, Florida v. Airbnb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broward County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broward County, Florida
Represented By: Hulda Odette Estama
Represented By: Rene Devlin Harrod
Represented By: Benjamin Crego
Represented By: Scott Andron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Shayne Levenberg Terwilleger
Represented By: Nicole K. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?