Reich v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: RENATA REICH
3Rd Party Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: Reich 4901, LLC, City of Lighthouse Point, Florida, The Estate of Giuseppe Arcuri, Unknown Tenant(s) and The Fidelity Land Trust Company, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60446
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Unknown Tenant(s). (ls)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant City of Lighthouse Point, Florida. (ls)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant The Fidelity Land Trust Company, LLC. (ls)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant The Estate of Giuseppe Arcuri. (ls)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Reich 4901, LLC. (ls)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Counter-Defendant Renata Reich. (ls)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Foreclosure and Damages against Renata Reich, The Estate of Giuseppe Arcuri, The Fidelity Land Trust Company, LLC, Unknown Tenant(s), Reich 4901, LLC, City of Lighthouse Point, Florida, COUNTERCLAIM against Renata Reich, The Estate of Giuseppe Arcuri, The Fidelity Land Trust Company, LLC, Unknown Tenant(s), Reich 4901, LLC, City of Lighthouse Point, Florida by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Notice of Default, #4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #5 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #6 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #7 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #8 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #9 Summon(s) Proposed Summons)(Mammana, Giselle)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Parties Not Listed on the Docket. (ls)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,,. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties. (ls)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Bank of America, N.A. (Mammana, Giselle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Declaratory, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Foreclosure and Damages against Renata Reich, COUNTERCLAIM against Renata Reich by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Notice of Default, #4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #5 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #6 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #7 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #8 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #9 Summon(s) Proposed Summons)(Mammana, Giselle)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Mammana, Giselle)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint no later than March 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/28/2019. (smz)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,,, to Complaint. Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mammana, Giselle) Modified Link on 2/27/2019 (ls).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER Denying #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has not stated any reason, much less good cause, why a 30-day extension should be granted. The Court further notes that Defendant's certificate of conferral is ambiguous as to whether "Counsel for Plaintiff did not respond with any objections or opposition to the Motion," or counsel for Plaintiff did not respond at all. Neither does it appear that Defendant has filed a proposed order as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). Finally, the Court observes that the requested 30-day extension would not, as Defendant states, result in a new deadline of March 27, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/26/2019. (smz)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Mammana, Giselle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Mammana, Giselle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11407252, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Mammana, Giselle) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 2/20/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reich v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Giselle Mammana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENATA REICH
Represented By: Rachel Mendes Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Reich 4901, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: City of Lighthouse Point, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Estate of Giuseppe Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Unknown Tenant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Fidelity Land Trust Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?