Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. v. abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz et al

Plaintiff: Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.
Defendant: cars-chance.com, delikatesinne.de, mimundomeinewelt.com, novaestudio.es, samuelpoutoux.fr, dobrzeozdrowiu.eu, quasarcenter.es, advikasoft.com, addicted-dreams.de, aehtf.es, gabrielahorn.com, profsezimar.com, meinetrailer.de, npactivepearls.com, uoe5estol.es, khristina-bellydance.fr, tarracobeer.es, kigyobiyori.com, melissawilliams.se, ap-search.de, hallo-engel.com, iitr.fr, farmatcedarbrook.com, anchoragebar.co.uk, lesvisionsdedgar.fr, drjanemcelduff.com, renov-atout.fr, note-ambiance.fr, bourcefranc-jack-durvicq.fr, cgtinalsa.com, restaurantlacamila.com, pdca.es, yeldarbgallery.com, maison-bois-beziers.fr, debbiegfitness.com, sib24-allgaeu.de, shelbywebworks.com, leschapardeurs.fr, hairsalonhowardoh.com, abercrombiebon.cn, kida-shiho.com, mesdecoration.fr, jamoneat.com, johnsidlo.com, ropaoutletmadird.es, thomasweigt.com, leechamberlin.com, michelleheartsryan.com, galerieloket.se, water-server.net, dimareseafoods.com, boietlogis.fr, barbara-gardain.de, letraitdunionparis.fr, dogandpuppyshop.com, plus-forts-ensemble.fr, recanvis-vidiella.es, ilina.es, abercrombiesgreece.com, motosvinola.com, escuelainfantilpumuky.es, r2ci.fr, countystandardtime.com, eifelschiris.de, pachecoyco.com, abercrombieandfitchsdeutschland.com, areainnova.es, cloverwillrun.com, weston-ivy.fr, losabaloriosdeeva.es, jennelah.com, petsitting.es, easy-typo3.de, madritec.com.es, humptechtips.com, santelmorestaurante.es, anrmoon.fr, project-c-rendsburg.de, mc-kleinwalsertal.de, cisel.es, mont-ster.eu, hollisterblackfriday.de, osonslabanlieue.com, rentacarspoland.com, dediadi.es, ecotic-media.fr, transworksmn.com, glas-govor-sluh.com, tenor-products.com, no-id-clothing.fr, bryniaumtb.co.uk, villagevietnamien.com, timecoach.es, aresdin.es, nds61.fr, frankalexdancestudio.com, bois-roumanie.fr, aagt.fr, premiumstore.es, clothingr.com, cmniigata.com, reemabdellatif.com, lesdouceursdecandy.fr, letortoni.fr, maisondeslandes.fr, clothingclearancewholesale.co.uk, dreigestirn-he-roe.de, brands-in-fashion.se, lacellabella.com, constant-duval.fr, autosfrance.fr, knochenbox.de, madisonsquash.fr, tumblebustime.com, borjasarasola.es, ethemmercan.com, jeunes-agriculteurs-06.fr, autolabcutlerbay.com, maxinesinvitations.com, reservahotelestoledo.es, pensioncanine76.fr, blcproperties.com, attackwing.de, rubberinroads.com, aeropoeles.fr, goodfellowdollclothes.com, sistaminutenkreta.se, gite-lesforgesdelauxois.fr, abercrombiesjapann.com, cdentaria-cq.com, banihsan.com, kilometro08.es, zflawyers.com, lyssandroo.com, abercrombie-fitch-hollister.fr, beyourguidecordoba.es, francemooc.fr, kekhuisje.com, griecosservice.com, fifaultimateteam.fr, allchicken.fr, legrizzlybar.fr, cynthiachazen.com, affiches-films.fr, web-instep.com, lecarbet-theatrenoir.fr, lesgitesduberger.fr, legends-barbershop.com, taxservicesbuffalo.com, babbla.se, maisonsboisconstructeur.fr, opensocietyparadox.com, darlinamarie.com, yellow-best.com, emprendereneltercersector.es, albumdefotos.com.es, newyorkprepproblems.com, brightnetbusiness.com, ajipa.es, overthetoplandscaping.com, codyaglerracing.com, ginvisibledesign.com, mudanzascasillas.es, lacenadegrow.es, jacc-maconnerie.fr, chemisepascherfemme.fr, comprar-ropa-online.es, locchalet2alpes.com, vitalyogathebook.com, bigplusdesign.com, mmrinformationsystems.com, forodehellin.es, alexanderssoncoaching.se, jbandcobuilders.com, abercrombieoutlet.com, ropaonlinebaratas.es, abercrombiesaleonlineshop.de, amf-direkt.de, zapatillas-kick.es, normanrockwellband.com, jtaurina.com, spacehostelygn.com, hastminne.se, jordifont.es, annebijoux.fr, serviceguitar.com, alwaysendures.com, instalacionesmartin.es, abercrombiesturkiye.com, bsefrance.fr, alzirateveu.es, chateauminiac.fr, cindemirticaret.com, hdsf.fr, coralshoresalumni.com, ropacamisasbarato.es, tauch-boot.de, apartments-promajna.com, cleverauktions.de, propertygisborne.com, axa-simonneau.fr, personal-ized4u.com, venetian-pethospital.com, topshop888.com, beatsmeetoexle.de, karenshankle.com, altabdesign.com, shirtsonlineau.com, mracemath.com, xiop.fr, sjiekensjabby.nl, arcarrier.com, jm-florance.com, golfdesign.es, milisalinphotography.com, savingthecure.com, weeeb.es, conquistadors.es, even-art.es, senoforum.es, linnovakarriar.se, islandhouseqb.co.uk, abercrombieandfitchshoponline.com, cirkus-palace.fr, marpesia.es, hopeholz.com, vinyl-manufacture.de, unmomentpourlenfance.fr, ecopbb.fr, abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz, floresoviedo.es, erikaalstrom.com, halkalikurutemizleme.com and stop-accrocs.fr
Case Number: 0:2019cv60567
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Show Cause Response due by 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 26, 2019 Filing 23 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Entry Of Final Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment And Permanent Injunction)(Gigante, Virgilio)
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #17 Order, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
April 10, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #17 Order, via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
April 10, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #17 Order, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to aagt.fr, abercrombie-fitch-hollister.fr, abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz, abercrombieandfitchsdeutschland.com, abercrombieandfitchshoponline.com, abercrombiebon.cn, abercrombieoutlet.com, abercrombiesaleonlineshop.de, abercrombiesgreece.com, abercrombiesjapann.com, abercrombiesturkiye.com, addicted-dreams.de, advikasoft.com, aehtf.es, aeropoeles.fr, affiches-films.fr, ajipa.es, albumdefotos.com.es, alexanderssoncoaching.se, allchicken.fr, altabdesign.com, alwaysendures.com, alzirateveu.es, amf-direkt.de, anchoragebar.co.uk, annebijoux.fr, anrmoon.fr, ap-search.de, apartments-promajna.com, arcarrier.com, areainnova.es, aresdin.es, attackwing.de, autolabcutlerbay.com, autosfrance.fr, axa-simonneau.fr, babbla.se, banihsan.com, barbara-gardain.de, beatsmeetoexle.de, beyourguidecordoba.es, bigplusdesign.com, blcproperties.com, boietlogis.fr, bois-roumanie.fr, borjasarasola.es, bourcefranc-jack-durvicq.fr, brands-in-fashion.se, brightnetbusiness.com, bryniaumtb.co.uk, bsefrance.fr, cars-chance.com, cdentaria-cq.com, cgtinalsa.com, chateauminiac.fr, chemisepascherfemme.fr, cindemirticaret.com, cirkus-palace.fr, cisel.es, cleverauktions.de, clothingclearancewholesale.co.uk, clothingr.com, cloverwillrun.com, cmniigata.com, codyaglerracing.com, comprar-ropa-online.es, conquistadors.es, constant-duval.fr, coralshoresalumni.com, countystandardtime.com, cynthiachazen.com, darlinamarie.com, debbiegfitness.com, dediadi.es, delikatesinne.de, dimareseafoods.com, dobrzeozdrowiu.eu, dogandpuppyshop.com, dreigestirn-he-roe.de, drjanemcelduff.com, easy-typo3.de, ecopbb.fr, ecotic-media.fr, eifelschiris.de, emprendereneltercersector.es, erikaalstrom.com, escuelainfantilpumuky.es, ethemmercan.com, even-art.es, farmatcedarbrook.com, fifaultimateteam.fr, floresoviedo.es, forodehellin.es, francemooc.fr, frankalexdancestudio.com, gabrielahorn.com, galerieloket.se, ginvisibledesign.com, gite-lesforgesdelauxois.fr, glas-govor-sluh.com, golfdesign.es, goodfellowdollclothes.com, griecosservice.com, hairsalonhowardoh.com, halkalikurutemizleme.com, hallo-engel.com, hastminne.se, hdsf.fr, hollisterblackfriday.de, hopeholz.com, humptechtips.com, iitr.fr, ilina.es, instalacionesmartin.es, islandhouseqb.co.uk, jacc-maconnerie.fr, jamoneat.com, jbandcobuilders.com, jennelah.com, jeunes-agriculteurs-06.fr, jm-florance.com, johnsidlo.com, jordifont.es, jtaurina.com, karenshankle.com, kekhuisje.com, khristina-bellydance.fr, kida-shiho.com, kigyobiyori.com, kilometro08.es, knochenbox.de, lacellabella.com, lacenadegrow.es, lecarbet-theatrenoir.fr, leechamberlin.com, legends-barbershop.com, legrizzlybar.fr, leschapardeurs.fr, lesdouceursdecandy.fr, lesgitesduberger.fr, lesvisionsdedgar.fr, letortoni.fr, letraitdunionparis.fr, linnovakarriar.se, locchalet2alpes.com, losabaloriosdeeva.es, lyssandroo.com, madisonsquash.fr, madritec.com.es, maison-bois-beziers.fr, maisondeslandes.fr, maisonsboisconstructeur.fr, marpesia.es, maxinesinvitations.com, mc-kleinwalsertal.de, meinetrailer.de, melissawilliams.se, mesdecoration.fr, michelleheartsryan.com, milisalinphotography.com, mimundomeinewelt.com, mmrinformationsystems.com, mont-ster.eu, motosvinola.com, mracemath.com, mudanzascasillas.es, nds61.fr, newyorkprepproblems.com, no-id-clothing.fr, normanrockwellband.com, note-ambiance.fr, novaestudio.es, npactivepearls.com, opensocietyparadox.com, osonslabanlieue.com, overthetoplandscaping.com, pachecoyco.com, pdca.es, pensioncanine76.fr, personal-ized4u.com, petsitting.es, plus-forts-ensemble.fr, premiumstore.es, profsezimar.com, project-c-rendsburg.de, propertygisborne.com, quasarcenter.es, r2ci.fr, recanvis-vidiella.es, reemabdellatif.com, renov-atout.fr, rentacarspoland.com, reservahotelestoledo.es, restaurantlacamila.com, ropacamisasbarato.es, ropaonlinebaratas.es, ropaoutletmadird.es, rubberinroads.com, samuelpoutoux.fr, santelmorestaurante.es, savingthecure.com, senoforum.es, serviceguitar.com, shelbywebworks.com, shirtsonlineau.com, sib24-allgaeu.de, sistaminutenkreta.se, sjiekensjabby.nl, spacehostelygn.com, stop-accrocs.fr, tarracobeer.es, tauch-boot.de, taxservicesbuffalo.com, tenor-products.com, thomasweigt.com, timecoach.es, topshop888.com, transworksmn.com, tumblebustime.com, unmomentpourlenfance.fr, uoe5estol.es, venetian-pethospital.com, villagevietnamien.com, vinyl-manufacture.de, vitalyogathebook.com, water-server.net, web-instep.com, weeeb.es, weston-ivy.fr, xiop.fr, yeldarbgallery.com, yellow-best.com, zapatillas-kick.es, zflawyers.com. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/2/2019. (cbr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to aagt.fr, abercrombie-fitch-hollister.fr, abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz, abercrombieandfitchsdeutschland.com, abercrombieandfitchshoponline.com, abercrombiebon.cn, abercrombieoutlet.com, abercrombiesaleonlineshop.de, abercrombiesgreece.com, abercrombiesjapann.com, abercrombiesturkiye.com, addicted-dreams.de, advikasoft.com, aehtf.es, aeropoeles.fr, affiches-films.fr, ajipa.es, albumdefotos.com.es, alexanderssoncoaching.se, allchicken.fr, altabdesign.com, alwaysendures.com, alzirateveu.es, amf-direkt.de, anchoragebar.co.uk, annebijoux.fr, anrmoon.fr, ap-search.de, apartments-promajna.com, arcarrier.com, areainnova.es, aresdin.es, attackwing.de, autolabcutlerbay.com, autosfrance.fr, axa-simonneau.fr, babbla.se, banihsan.com, barbara-gardain.de, beatsmeetoexle.de, beyourguidecordoba.es, bigplusdesign.com, blcproperties.com, boietlogis.fr, bois-roumanie.fr, borjasarasola.es, bourcefranc-jack-durvicq.fr, brands-in-fashion.se, brightnetbusiness.com, bryniaumtb.co.uk, bsefrance.fr, cars-chance.com, cdentaria-cq.com, cgtinalsa.com, chateauminiac.fr, chemisepascherfemme.fr, cindemirticaret.com, cirkus-palace.fr, cisel.es, cleverauktions.de, clothingclearancewholesale.co.uk, clothingr.com, cloverwillrun.com, cmniigata.com, codyaglerracing.com, comprar-ropa-online.es, conquistadors.es, constant-duval.fr, coralshoresalumni.com, countystandardtime.com, cynthiachazen.com, darlinamarie.com, debbiegfitness.com, dediadi.es, delikatesinne.de, dimareseafoods.com, dobrzeozdrowiu.eu, dogandpuppyshop.com, dreigestirn-he-roe.de, drjanemcelduff.com, easy-typo3.de, ecopbb.fr, ecotic-media.fr, eifelschiris.de, emprendereneltercersector.es, erikaalstrom.com, escuelainfantilpumuky.es, ethemmercan.com, even-art.es, farmatcedarbrook.com, fifaultimateteam.fr, floresoviedo.es, forodehellin.es, francemooc.fr, frankalexdancestudio.com, gabrielahorn.com, galerieloket.se, ginvisibledesign.com, gite-lesforgesdelauxois.fr, glas-govor-sluh.com, golfdesign.es, goodfellowdollclothes.com, griecosservice.com, hairsalonhowardoh.com, halkalikurutemizleme.com, hallo-engel.com, hastminne.se, hdsf.fr, hollisterblackfriday.de, hopeholz.com, humptechtips.com, iitr.fr, ilina.es, instalacionesmartin.es, islandhouseqb.co.uk, jacc-maconnerie.fr, jamoneat.com, jbandcobuilders.com, jennelah.com, jeunes-agriculteurs-06.fr, jm-florance.com, johnsidlo.com, jordifont.es, jtaurina.com, karenshankle.com, kekhuisje.com, khristina-bellydance.fr, kida-shiho.com, kigyobiyori.com, kilometro08.es, knochenbox.de, lacellabella.com, lacenadegrow.es, lecarbet-theatrenoir.fr, leechamberlin.com, legends-barbershop.com, legrizzlybar.fr, leschapardeurs.fr, lesdouceursdecandy.fr, lesgitesduberger.fr, lesvisionsdedgar.fr, letortoni.fr, letraitdunionparis.fr, linnovakarriar.se, locchalet2alpes.com, losabaloriosdeeva.es, lyssandroo.com, madisonsquash.fr, madritec.com.es, maison-bois-beziers.fr, maisondeslandes.fr, maisonsboisconstructeur.fr, marpesia.es, maxinesinvitations.com, mc-kleinwalsertal.de, meinetrailer.de, melissawilliams.se, mesdecoration.fr, michelleheartsryan.com, milisalinphotography.com, mimundomeinewelt.com, mmrinformationsystems.com, mont-ster.eu, motosvinola.com, mracemath.com, mudanzascasillas.es, nds61.fr, newyorkprepproblems.com, no-id-clothing.fr, normanrockwellband.com, note-ambiance.fr, novaestudio.es, npactivepearls.com, opensocietyparadox.com, osonslabanlieue.com, overthetoplandscaping.com, pachecoyco.com, pdca.es, pensioncanine76.fr, personal-ized4u.com, petsitting.es, plus-forts-ensemble.fr, premiumstore.es, profsezimar.com, project-c-rendsburg.de, propertygisborne.com, quasarcenter.es, r2ci.fr, recanvis-vidiella.es, reemabdellatif.com, renov-atout.fr, rentacarspoland.com, reservahotelestoledo.es, restaurantlacamila.com, ropacamisasbarato.es, ropaonlinebaratas.es, ropaoutletmadird.es, rubberinroads.com, samuelpoutoux.fr, santelmorestaurante.es, savingthecure.com, senoforum.es, serviceguitar.com, shelbywebworks.com, shirtsonlineau.com, sib24-allgaeu.de, sistaminutenkreta.se, sjiekensjabby.nl, spacehostelygn.com, stop-accrocs.fr, tarracobeer.es, tauch-boot.de, taxservicesbuffalo.com, tenor-products.com, thomasweigt.com, timecoach.es, topshop888.com, transworksmn.com, tumblebustime.com, unmomentpourlenfance.fr, uoe5estol.es, venetian-pethospital.com, villagevietnamien.com, vinyl-manufacture.de, vitalyogathebook.com, water-server.net, web-instep.com, weeeb.es, weston-ivy.fr, xiop.fr, yeldarbgallery.com, yellow-best.com, zapatillas-kick.es, zflawyers.com by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, granted re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2019 re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (vty)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. aagt.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombie-fitch-hollister.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombieandfitchsdeutschland.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombieandfitchshoponline.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombiebon.cn served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombieoutlet.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombiesaleonlineshop.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombiesgreece.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombiesjapann.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; abercrombiesturkiye.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; addicted-dreams.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; advikasoft.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; aehtf.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; aeropoeles.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; affiches-films.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ajipa.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; albumdefotos.com.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; alexanderssoncoaching.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; allchicken.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; altabdesign.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; alwaysendures.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; alzirateveu.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; amf-direkt.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; anchoragebar.co.uk served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; annebijoux.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; anrmoon.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ap-search.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; apartments-promajna.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; arcarrier.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; areainnova.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; aresdin.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; attackwing.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; autolabcutlerbay.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; autosfrance.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; axa-simonneau.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; babbla.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; banihsan.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; barbara-gardain.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; beatsmeetoexle.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; beyourguidecordoba.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; bigplusdesign.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; blcproperties.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; boietlogis.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; bois-roumanie.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; borjasarasola.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; bourcefranc-jack-durvicq.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; brands-in-fashion.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; brightnetbusiness.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; bryniaumtb.co.uk served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; bsefrance.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cars-chance.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cdentaria-cq.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cgtinalsa.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; chateauminiac.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; chemisepascherfemme.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cindemirticaret.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cirkus-palace.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cisel.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cleverauktions.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; clothingclearancewholesale.co.uk served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; clothingr.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cloverwillrun.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cmniigata.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; codyaglerracing.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; comprar-ropa-online.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; conquistadors.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; constant-duval.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; coralshoresalumni.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; countystandardtime.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; cynthiachazen.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; darlinamarie.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; debbiegfitness.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; dediadi.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; delikatesinne.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; dimareseafoods.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; dobrzeozdrowiu.eu served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; dogandpuppyshop.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; dreigestirn-he-roe.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; drjanemcelduff.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; easy-typo3.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ecopbb.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ecotic-media.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; eifelschiris.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; emprendereneltercersector.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; erikaalstrom.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; escuelainfantilpumuky.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ethemmercan.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; even-art.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; farmatcedarbrook.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; fifaultimateteam.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; floresoviedo.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; forodehellin.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; francemooc.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; frankalexdancestudio.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; gabrielahorn.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; galerieloket.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ginvisibledesign.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; gite-lesforgesdelauxois.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; glas-govor-sluh.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; golfdesign.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; goodfellowdollclothes.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; griecosservice.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; hairsalonhowardoh.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; halkalikurutemizleme.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; hallo-engel.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; hastminne.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; hdsf.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; hollisterblackfriday.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; hopeholz.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; humptechtips.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; iitr.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ilina.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; instalacionesmartin.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; islandhouseqb.co.uk served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jacc-maconnerie.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jamoneat.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jbandcobuilders.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jennelah.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jeunes-agriculteurs-06.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jm-florance.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; johnsidlo.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jordifont.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; jtaurina.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; karenshankle.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; kekhuisje.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; khristina-bellydance.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; kida-shiho.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; kigyobiyori.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; kilometro08.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; knochenbox.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lacellabella.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lacenadegrow.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lecarbet-theatrenoir.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; leechamberlin.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; legends-barbershop.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; legrizzlybar.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; leschapardeurs.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lesdouceursdecandy.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lesgitesduberger.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lesvisionsdedgar.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; letortoni.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; letraitdunionparis.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; linnovakarriar.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; locchalet2alpes.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; losabaloriosdeeva.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; lyssandroo.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; madisonsquash.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; madritec.com.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; maison-bois-beziers.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; maisondeslandes.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; maisonsboisconstructeur.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; marpesia.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; maxinesinvitations.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mc-kleinwalsertal.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; meinetrailer.de served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; melissawilliams.se served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mesdecoration.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; michelleheartsryan.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; milisalinphotography.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mimundomeinewelt.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mmrinformationsystems.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mont-ster.eu served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; motosvinola.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mracemath.com served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; mudanzascasillas.es served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; nds61.fr served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; newyorkprepproblems.
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #12 Bond, #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , #3 Form AO 120/121, #1 Complaint, #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #10 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #12 Bond, #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , #3 Form AO 120/121, #1 Complaint, #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #10 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 Seizure Bond BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. Approved by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (mee)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cbr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. re #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/28/2019 01:15 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified to unseal per DE #8 on 3/7/2019 (cbr).
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Wood in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified to unseal per DE #8 on 3/7/2019 (cbr).
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. identifying Corporate Parent Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Corporate Parent J.M.H. Trademark, Inc. for Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. (Gigante, Virgilio)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11442111, filed by Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Abercrombie Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co. v. abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cars-chance.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: delikatesinne.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mimundomeinewelt.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: novaestudio.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: samuelpoutoux.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dobrzeozdrowiu.eu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: quasarcenter.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: advikasoft.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: addicted-dreams.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aehtf.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gabrielahorn.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: profsezimar.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: meinetrailer.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: npactivepearls.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uoe5estol.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: khristina-bellydance.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tarracobeer.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kigyobiyori.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: melissawilliams.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ap-search.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hallo-engel.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iitr.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: farmatcedarbrook.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anchoragebar.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lesvisionsdedgar.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: drjanemcelduff.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: renov-atout.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: note-ambiance.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bourcefranc-jack-durvicq.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cgtinalsa.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: restaurantlacamila.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pdca.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yeldarbgallery.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maison-bois-beziers.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: debbiegfitness.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sib24-allgaeu.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shelbywebworks.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: leschapardeurs.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hairsalonhowardoh.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombiebon.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kida-shiho.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mesdecoration.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jamoneat.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: johnsidlo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ropaoutletmadird.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thomasweigt.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: leechamberlin.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: michelleheartsryan.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: galerieloket.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: water-server.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dimareseafoods.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: boietlogis.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: barbara-gardain.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: letraitdunionparis.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dogandpuppyshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: plus-forts-ensemble.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: recanvis-vidiella.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ilina.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombiesgreece.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: motosvinola.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: escuelainfantilpumuky.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: r2ci.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: countystandardtime.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eifelschiris.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pachecoyco.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombieandfitchsdeutschland.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: areainnova.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cloverwillrun.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: weston-ivy.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: losabaloriosdeeva.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jennelah.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: petsitting.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: easy-typo3.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: madritec.com.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: humptechtips.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: santelmorestaurante.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anrmoon.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: project-c-rendsburg.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mc-kleinwalsertal.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cisel.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mont-ster.eu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollisterblackfriday.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: osonslabanlieue.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rentacarspoland.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dediadi.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ecotic-media.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: transworksmn.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: glas-govor-sluh.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tenor-products.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: no-id-clothing.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bryniaumtb.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: villagevietnamien.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: timecoach.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aresdin.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nds61.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: frankalexdancestudio.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bois-roumanie.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aagt.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: premiumstore.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: clothingr.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cmniigata.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reemabdellatif.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lesdouceursdecandy.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: letortoni.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maisondeslandes.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: clothingclearancewholesale.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dreigestirn-he-roe.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brands-in-fashion.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lacellabella.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: constant-duval.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: autosfrance.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: knochenbox.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: madisonsquash.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tumblebustime.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: borjasarasola.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ethemmercan.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jeunes-agriculteurs-06.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: autolabcutlerbay.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maxinesinvitations.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reservahotelestoledo.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pensioncanine76.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: blcproperties.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: attackwing.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rubberinroads.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aeropoeles.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goodfellowdollclothes.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sistaminutenkreta.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gite-lesforgesdelauxois.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombiesjapann.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cdentaria-cq.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: banihsan.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kilometro08.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zflawyers.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lyssandroo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombie-fitch-hollister.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beyourguidecordoba.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: francemooc.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kekhuisje.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: griecosservice.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fifaultimateteam.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: allchicken.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: legrizzlybar.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cynthiachazen.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: affiches-films.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: web-instep.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lecarbet-theatrenoir.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lesgitesduberger.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: legends-barbershop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: taxservicesbuffalo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: babbla.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maisonsboisconstructeur.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: opensocietyparadox.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: darlinamarie.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yellow-best.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: emprendereneltercersector.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: albumdefotos.com.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newyorkprepproblems.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brightnetbusiness.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ajipa.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: overthetoplandscaping.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: codyaglerracing.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ginvisibledesign.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mudanzascasillas.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lacenadegrow.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jacc-maconnerie.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chemisepascherfemme.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: comprar-ropa-online.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: locchalet2alpes.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vitalyogathebook.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bigplusdesign.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mmrinformationsystems.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: forodehellin.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alexanderssoncoaching.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jbandcobuilders.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombieoutlet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ropaonlinebaratas.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombiesaleonlineshop.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: amf-direkt.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zapatillas-kick.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: normanrockwellband.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jtaurina.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: spacehostelygn.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hastminne.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jordifont.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annebijoux.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: serviceguitar.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alwaysendures.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: instalacionesmartin.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombiesturkiye.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bsefrance.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alzirateveu.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chateauminiac.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cindemirticaret.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hdsf.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: coralshoresalumni.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ropacamisasbarato.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tauch-boot.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: apartments-promajna.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cleverauktions.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: propertygisborne.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: axa-simonneau.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: personal-ized4u.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: venetian-pethospital.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: topshop888.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beatsmeetoexle.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: karenshankle.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: altabdesign.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shirtsonlineau.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mracemath.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xiop.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sjiekensjabby.nl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: arcarrier.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jm-florance.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: golfdesign.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: milisalinphotography.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: savingthecure.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: weeeb.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: conquistadors.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: even-art.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: senoforum.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: linnovakarriar.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: islandhouseqb.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombieandfitchshoponline.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cirkus-palace.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: marpesia.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hopeholz.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vinyl-manufacture.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unmomentpourlenfance.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ecopbb.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abercrombieandfitchsaleuk.xyz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: floresoviedo.es
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: erikaalstrom.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: halkalikurutemizleme.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stop-accrocs.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abercrombie & Fitch Trading Co.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?