Blue Truck Media, Inc. v. Danny Cox Digital, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc. and Blue Truck Media, Inc.
Defendant: Stephanie Cox, Daniel R. Cox, DANNY COX DIGITAL LLC and Danny Cox Digital, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60586
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, filed by Blue Truck Media, Inc. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Closing Case. Motions terminated: #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, filed by Blue Truck Media, Inc.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Blue Truck Media, Inc.. Responses due by 4/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order with injunction)(Dutkiewicz, Edward)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/26/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Party Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the incorrect party as served. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#12]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Blue Truck Media, Inc.. Stephanie Cox served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #11)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc.. BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc. served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Dutkiewicz, Edward)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Striking #7 Certificate of Service filed by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc. by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc. (Dutkiewicz, Edward) Modified Text on 4/4/2019 (ls).
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Event Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed. (ls)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to Show Cause by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' web page, #2 Exhibit Attempted service, #3 Exhibit Danny Cox Digital, corporate papers)(Dutkiewicz, Edward)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc. re #5 Order to Show Cause (Dutkiewicz, Edward)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc.. DANNY COX DIGITAL LLC served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Dutkiewicz, Edward)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Show Cause Response due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Daniel R. Cox, Stephanie Cox, DANNY COX DIGITAL LLC. (pcs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11448857, filed by BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Incorporation Articles, Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit Defs web page showing Ownership, #5 Exhibit registration of trademark, #6 Exhibit Defs web page, describing services, #7 Exhibit Pltfs web page, showing notice, #8 Exhibit Defs twitter page, #9 Exhibit Pltfs first letter to Defs, #10 Exhibit Pltfs second letter to Defs, #11 Exhibit cloudflare, notice of misuse of trademark)(Dutkiewicz, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Truck Media, Inc. v. Danny Cox Digital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANNY COX DIGITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Cox Digital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE TRUCK MEDIA Inc.
Represented By: Edward Paul Dutkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Truck Media, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Paul Dutkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?