Zapata v. Strain et al

Plaintiff: Randy Zapata
Defendant: M.D. Richard E. Strain, Jr.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60587
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge NOT SIGNED by all parties. Filed by Randy Zapata. See #9 for image (asl) Modified date filed on 5/3/2019 (asl).
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Show Just Cause, MOTION to Dismiss Order requiring certificates #9 (ecf no. #6 )and the Motion to Quash Process and Service of Process or alternatively, to Dismiss Filled by Defendant Dr. Richard E. Strain, Jr. (ecf No. #7 ) ( Responses due by 5/16/2019), by Randy Zapata. (mee) Modified title text on 5/3/2019 (asl).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 MOTION for Hearing filed by Randy Zapata, #7 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Process and Service of Process or Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Richard E. Strain, Jr., #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Randy Zapata Recommending RECOMMENDED that the Complaint be DISMISSED, without prejudice, and all pending motions be DENIED as moot, including the Plaintiff's "Motion to Show Just Cause" ECF No. #3 , "Motion to Adhere Judge Jose E. Martinez Order Requiring Certificates" ECF No. #6 , and the Motion to Quash Process and Service of Process or, Alternatively, to Dismiss filed by the Defendant Dr. Richard E. Strain, Jr. ECF No. #7 . Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Process and Service of Process or Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Richard E. Strain, Jr. Attorney Kenneth William Morgan, Jr added to party Richard E. Strain, Jr(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morgan, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Adhere Judge Jose E. Martinez Order Requiring Certificates for Hearing by Randy Zapata. (mee)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS,referring CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and for a Report and Recommendation., ORDER REFERRING #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Randy Zapata. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Show Just Cause by Randy Zapata. (mee)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office Worker's Conpensation Program, Richard E. Strain, Jr. Filing fees $ 400.00, No IFP filed by Randy Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(mee)Text Modified on 3/7/2019 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapata v. Strain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Richard E. Strain, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth William Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?