Pieczynski et al v. Jetsmarter, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Pieczynski and Diane Pieczynski
Defendant: Jetsmarter, Inc., John Does 1-4 and David M Sheridan
Case Number: 0:2019cv60588
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Civil Case Placed in Civil Suspense File, following #13 Order Granting by Default Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (km02)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting by default #8 Defendants' Verified Motion to Dismiss or Stay and to Compel Arbitration, Pursuant to Contract. The Parties are hereby COMPELLED to proceed with arbitration pursuant to the terms of the applicable contract. The Clerk of this Court shall mark this cause as closed for statistical purposes and place the matter in a civil suspense file. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Pursuant to Contract filed by Jetsmarter, Inc., David M Sheridan. Responses due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 4/25/2019. (pb00)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for any and all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Pursuant to Contract by Diane Pieczynski, James Pieczynski. (Baldinger, Bruce)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Pending, Related, And Similar Actions by Jetsmarter, Inc., David M Sheridan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sacher, Joseph) Modified TEXT on 4/8/2019 (vmz).
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Pursuant to Contract by Jetsmarter, Inc., David M Sheridan. Attorney Joseph Alan Sacher added to party Jetsmarter, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Alan Sacher added to party David M Sheridan(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A - Membership Agreements, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B - Invoices, #3 Exhibit Abraham Decision and Order, #4 Exhibit Partial Award AAA Class, #5 Exhibit Milosavljevic Minute Order)(Sacher, Joseph)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 6 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Pieczynski, Diane Pieczynski. Jetsmarter, Inc. served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; David M Sheridan served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. See DE #5 for image. (kpe) Modified on 3/29/2019 (kpe).
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Pieczynski, James Pieczynski Cert of Service - Sheridan (Baldinger, Bruce)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Pieczynski, James Pieczynski Cert of Service - Jetsmarter (Baldinger, Bruce)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jetsmarter, Inc., David M Sheridan. (jao)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT James Pieczynski and Diane Pieczynski against John Does 1-4, Jetsmarter, Inc., David M Sheridan. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11448918, filed by James Pieczynski, Diane Pieczynski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons - Jetsmarter, #3 Summon(s) Summons - Sheridan)(Baldinger, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pieczynski et al v. Jetsmarter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pieczynski
Represented By: Steven Mark Katzman
Represented By: Bruce Eric Baldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Pieczynski
Represented By: Steven Mark Katzman
Represented By: Bruce Eric Baldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetsmarter, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Alan Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Sheridan
Represented By: Joseph Alan Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?