Rey et al v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC,
Plaintiff: Tami L Rey and Andres Rey
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, and OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv60706
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2019., Expert Discovery due by 10/25/2019., Fact Discovery due by 10/25/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/26/2019., In Limine Motions due by 1/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2019., Motions due by 1/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/20/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle all Non-Dispositive Pretrial Motions. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle added. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 First SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Andres Rey, Tami L Rey (Farrow, Jay)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Andres Rey, Tami L Rey (Farrow, Jay)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC. (Reck, Linda)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda M. Reck on behalf of OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC,. Attorney Linda M. Reck added to party OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC,(pty:dft). (Reck, Linda)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Exhibits. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC,. (pcs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11484659, filed by Andres Rey, Tami L Rey. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrow, Jay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2019: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rey et al v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Linda M. Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami L Rey
Represented By: Jay Lewis Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Rey
Represented By: Jay Lewis Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?