Indivior Inc. et al v. Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Indivior UK Limited, Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. and Indivior Inc.
Defendant: Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc., Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv60757
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Beth Bloom
2 Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 the Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiffs shall file a response to #33 the Defendants' Answer and Counterclaims on or before July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/15/2019. (jrf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Inc., Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. for Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc. (Koziol, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apotex Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. for Apotex Inc., Apotex Inc. (Koziol, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apotex Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Corp., Apotex Corp. (Koziol, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc., Apotex Corp.. (Koziol, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Garrett E. Brown, Jr. (Cavallo, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. FURTHER, Counsel is unable to file any discovery motions without obtaining permission from Chambers first. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (sl00)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2019., Discovery due by 5/22/2020., Expert Discovery due by 5/22/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2019., Mediation Deadline 5/29/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/10/2020., Motions due by 6/19/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/10/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 10/6/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Magistrate Election Form)(Cavallo, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 06/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/7/2019. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/16/2019. (jrf)
May 15, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND FOR ALL PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT re #11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #1 Complaint, by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
May 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James F. Hibey. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11639800 by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jamie Lucia. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11639457 by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William A. Rakoczy, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11628676 by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul J. Molino, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11628675 by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
May 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Deanne M. Mazzochi, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11628673 by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
May 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher B. Roberts, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11628670 by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey A. Marx, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11628668 by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Attorney Peter Andrew Koziol added to party Apotex Corp. (pty:dft), Attorney Peter Andrew Koziol added to party Apotex Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Andrew Koziol added to party Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc. (pty:dft). Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koziol, Peter)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Philip S. May. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11624388 by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey H. Lerner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11624382 by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mathew Kudzin. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11624363 by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for R. Jason Fowler. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11624350 by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey B. Elikan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11624334 by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erica N. Andersen. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11624310 by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/20/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Roy Altman for all further proceedings, Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indivior Inc., Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Apotex Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waiver)(Cavallo, Christopher)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Indivior Inc., Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior UK Limited. Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waivers)(Cavallo, Christopher)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates of Interested Parties Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. (Etra, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited identifying Corporate Parent RBP Global Holdings Limited for Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited (Etra, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. (pcs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11498605, filed by Indivior Inc., Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s) Summons Aveva, #7 Summon(s) Summons Apotex Corp, #8 Summon(s) Summons Apotex Inc)(Etra, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indivior Inc. et al v. Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indivior UK Limited
Represented By: Jonathan Etra
Represented By: Christopher Cole Cavallo
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Elikan
Represented By: Matthew Kudzin
Represented By: Erica Andersen
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Lerner
Represented By: Robert Jason Fowler
Represented By: Philip S. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Etra
Represented By: Christopher Cole Cavallo
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jamie Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Etra
Represented By: Christopher Cole Cavallo
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Elikan
Represented By: Matthew Kudzin
Represented By: Erica Andersen
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Lerner
Represented By: Robert Jason Fowler
Represented By: Philip S. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Christopher B. Roberts
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Peter Andrew Koziol
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Christopher B. Roberts
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Peter Andrew Koziol
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Christopher B. Roberts
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Peter Andrew Koziol
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?