Dore et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Dexter Dore and Ingrid Dore
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv60759
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Dominic Brandy Mediation Deadline 8/26/2019. Mediation Hearing set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Dominic Brandy. Mediation Hearing set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Seale, Nyasha)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Dominic Brandy Notice of Mediation (Brandy, Dominic)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, Dominic Brandy. (Seale, Nyasha)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019., Discovery due by 11/5/2019., Expert Discovery due by 11/5/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2019., Mediation Deadline 11/19/2019., In Limine Motions due by 11/27/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2019., Motions due by 11/27/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/18/2020., Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/25/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dexter Dore, Ingrid Dore identifying Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings, Inc. D/B/A Geovera Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Claims Aid Consultants for Dexter Dore, Ingrid Dore (Vargas, Andrew)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Seale, Nyasha)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings, Inc. for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (Seale, Nyasha)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket) (Seale, Nyasha)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Seale, Nyasha)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company response due 3/29/2019.( Motions due by 4/22/2019., Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/15/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Dexter Dore and Ingrid Dore v Geovera Specialty Insurance Company) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11499332, filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A_Pl estimate, #2 Exhibit Ex. B_Prop appraiser, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement State Court Records)(Seale, Nyasha) Text Modified on 3/25/2019 (cds). No Answer/ Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dore et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Dore
Represented By: Andrew J. Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Dore
Represented By: Andrew J. Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nyasha Simone Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?