MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, et al,. v Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Plaintiff: Series 15-09-157, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and Series LLC
Defendant: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Case Number: 0:2019cv60797
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, or Strike Class Complaint and Memorandum of Law filed by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Allen, D)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, or Strike Class Complaint and Memorandum of Law filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series LLC. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Salviano, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's #10 Motion to Dismiss or Strike Class Complaint. Plaintiff must respond by June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/20/2019. (chd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #12 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,. Correction Other Correct Order attached and replaced at DE #12 . (ch1)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/20/2019) (ch1).
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to D's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Class Complaint by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series LLC. (Salviano, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, or Strike Class Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Responses due by 6/21/2019 (Allen, D)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series LLC (Salviano, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Matthew Allen on behalf of Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft). (Allen, D)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamine Reid on behalf of Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Attorney Benjamine Reid added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft). (Reid, Benjamine)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. The parties should carefully review the Order in that it requires expedited briefing, provides for modified page limitations and special conferral requirements before a motion is filed, limits the type of permissible discovery objections as well as modifying other discovery procedures. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 4/18/2019. (sl00)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Series LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 15-09-157. Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Salviano, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (mee) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/28/2019) (mee).
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under the Private Cause of Action Provisions of the Medicare Secondary Payer Act against Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11510104, filed by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC, Series 15-09-157. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Salviano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, et al,. v Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 15-09-157
Represented By: Michael James Salviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Michael James Salviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series LLC
Represented By: Michael James Salviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Represented By: D Matthew Allen
Represented By: Benjamine Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?