Weiner v. Podesto

Plaintiff: Wendi Weiner
Defendant: Mike Podesto
Case Number: 0:2019cv60859
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0512
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by Mike Podesto. (Pollack, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by Wendi Weiner. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Affidavit Vicki Fox)(Heitner, Darren)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Mike Podesto. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mike Podesto)(Pollack, David)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): David H. Pollack for the defendant, Alan Wilmot for the Plaintiff. (Digital 14:05:01-14:21:13) (at)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren Adam Heitner on behalf of Wendi Weiner (Heitner, Darren)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wendi Weiner (Heitner, Darren)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 6/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (mws)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER re #12 Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause ("Response"). Despite lingering concerns regarding defense counsel's representation in his #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint ("Motion") that he was "recently retained" (he admits in his Response that he was retained more than six weeks before he filed the Motion), the Court will leave undisturbed its 8 Order Granting Defendant's Motion. However, the Court cautions defense counsel to strictly adhere to Florida Bar Rule 4-3.3 requiring absolute candor to the tribunal going forward. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 5/29/2019. (pjn)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 10 Order, by Mike Podesto. (Pollack, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint filed by Mike Podesto. (Pollack, David)
May 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#10. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2019. (cqs)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER re #9 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint ("Response"). In light of the allegations in the Response, Defendant shall show cause on or before May 30, 2019 why the Court should not reconsider its 8 Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 5/29/2019. (pjn)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint filed by Wendi Weiner. Replies due by 6/5/2019. (Heitner, Darren)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before June 13, 2019. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 5/29/2019. (pjn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mike Podesto. Attorney David H. Pollack added to party Mike Podesto(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wendi Weiner. Mike Podesto served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Heitner, Darren)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 4/2/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters., Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mike Podesto. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Complaint attached to this form by mail) (mc)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mc)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11523595, filed by Wendi Weiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Heitner, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiner v. Podesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Podesto
Represented By: David H. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendi Weiner
Represented By: Darren Adam Heitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?