Frank v. Broward Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Frank
Defendant: Deputy Jane Doe, Deputy Damus, Deputy John Doe, Sergeant Joshua Neece, Acting Sheriff Gregory Tony, Broward Sheriff's Office and Sheriff Scott Israel
Case Number: 0:2019cv60935
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
2 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT on or before July 19, 2019., ( Amended Complaint due by 7/19/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #13 Amended Complaint. Correction Original document missing pages. Replaced with corrected document. (pes)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Acting Sheriff Gregory Tony, Broward Sheriff's Office, Damus, Jane Doe, John Doe, Scott Israel, Joshua Neece, filed by Kenneth A. Frank.(drz) (Main Document 13 replaced on 5/30/2019) (pes).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Reassignment to District Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz. Judge Federico A. Moreno no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350. The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (DE#8 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. The plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) Modified on 5/2/2019 (fbn).
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Institutional Bank Account Statement by Kenneth A. Frank re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, (drz)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUA SPONTE ORDER REQUIRING FINAL, AMENDED COMPLAINT on or before May 15, 2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this case on the proper form provided. ( Amended Complaint due by 5/15/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before May 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee, or may renew his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff renews his motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he/she must:a)Have the certificate concerning his/her prison bank account completed by an officer of the institution; and,b)Attach a certified copy of his/her prison/jail account for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint, in accordance with the above quoted statute. This must be a full statement of all deposits and withdrawals, not just a summary. Failure to pay the filing fee or renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis will result in dismissal of this case. Responses due by 5/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Percy J. Smith. signed by: Percy J. Smith by Percy J. Smith. (ar2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth A. Frank. (ar2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Acting Sheriff, BSO Deputy Damus, BSO Deputy Jane Doe, BSO Deputy John Doe, BSO Sergeant, Broward Sheriff's Office, Sheriff. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Kenneth A. Frank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. Broward Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Damus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joshua Neece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sheriff Gregory Tony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Scott Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?