LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. Cosmedique, LLC et al

Plaintiff: South Beach Skincare, Inc. and LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC, Vyacheslav Borodin and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 0:2019cv60978
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to Vyacheslav Borodin. (mc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. re #30 Amended Complaint,, filed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons) (Spielman, Darren)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION for October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. re #29 Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Spielman, Darren)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. Replies due by 7/9/2019. (Spielman, Darren)
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC, Vyacheslav Borodin, John Does 1-5, filed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Summon(s) Summons)(Spielman, Darren)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Requiring Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 Clerk's Appointment of Mediator: Bruce A. Blitman added (pt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Appoint Mediator(Spielman, Darren)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/19/2019. (fc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants filed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spielman, Darren)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants filed by Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC. Replies due by 6/25/2019. (Millan, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC. (Millan, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. (Spielman, Darren)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS DISCOVERY PROCEDURE ORDER. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting the undersigneds Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as a stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/14/2019. (pb00)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: (Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2019, All Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Expert Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Mediation Deadline 2/17/2020, In Limine Motions due by 3/24/2020, All pre-trial Motions due by 2/25/2020. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/24/2020.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 2/17/2020.) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Spielman, Darren)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING #16 SCHEDULING REPORT filed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. Order Requiring Compliance with this Court's Order. The parties are directed to file a Joint Scheduling Report in compliance with this Court's Order ECF #1 by no later than 6/7/2019) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by no later than June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/3/2019. (fc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN - Plaintiff's SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Spielman, Darren) -Modified/stricken per #18 Order on 6/3/2019 (gp).-
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC. (Millan, Stephen)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Thomas Millan on behalf of Global Media Group, LLC. Attorney Stephen Thomas Millan added to party Global Media Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Millan, Stephen)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Thomas Millan on behalf of Cosmedique, LLC. Attorney Stephen Thomas Millan added to party Cosmedique, LLC(pty:dft). (Millan, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Rodolfo Ruiz on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. Global Media Group, LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Spielman, Darren)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. Cosmedique, LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Spielman, Darren)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Reassignment to District Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz. Judge Federico A. Moreno no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. (Spielman, Darren)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Filing of Corrected Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 13) (Spielman, Darren)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (vmz)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC. (vmz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cosmedique, LLC, Global Media Group, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11562900, filed by LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC, South Beach Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons-Cosmedique, #3 Summon(s) Summons-Global Media Group, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1a, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Spielman, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. Cosmedique, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Beach Skincare, Inc.
Represented By: Darren Joel Spielman
Represented By: Robert Charles Kain, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole A. Valdivieso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFECELL IP HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Darren Joel Spielman
Represented By: Robert Charles Kain, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole A. Valdivieso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmedique, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vyacheslav Borodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?