Fernandez et al v. Odyssey Capital Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Boquete and Gustavo Fernandez
Defendant: Odyssey Capital Management, LLC, Guillermo Ares De Parga, Odyssey Financial Group LLC and Sebastian Ponceliz
Case Number: 0:2019cv61019
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #8 and Motion to Quash Service #9 by July 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/28/2019. (btr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Claudia Boquete, Gustavo Fernandez re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer (Attachments: #1 Amended Local Certificate) (Flint, Alexander)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Claudia Boquete, Gustavo Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flint, Alexander)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Guillermo Ares De Parga, Sebastian Ponceliz (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Haber, Tony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Guillermo Ares De Parga, Sebastian Ponceliz. (Haber, Tony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Odyssey Capital Management, LLC, Odyssey Financial Group LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Haber, Tony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tony Alexander Haber on behalf of Guillermo Ares De Parga, Sebastian Ponceliz. Attorney Tony Alexander Haber added to party Guillermo Ares De Parga(pty:dft), Attorney Tony Alexander Haber added to party Sebastian Ponceliz(pty:dft). (Haber, Tony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tony Alexander Haber on behalf of Odyssey Capital Management, LLC, Odyssey Financial Group LLC. Attorney Tony Alexander Haber added to party Odyssey Capital Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tony Alexander Haber added to party Odyssey Financial Group LLC(pty:dft). (Haber, Tony)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Guillermo Ares De Parga, Odyssey Capital Management, LLC, Odyssey Financial Group LLC, Sebastian Ponceliz. (lbc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gustavo Fernandez, Claudia Boquete. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Flint, Alexander)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11578316, filed by Gustavo Fernandez, Claudia Boquete. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flint, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. Odyssey Capital Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Boquete
Represented By: Irain Alberto Gonzalez
Represented By: Alexander Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Fernandez
Represented By: Irain Alberto Gonzalez
Represented By: Alexander Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Tony Alexander Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Ares De Parga
Represented By: Tony Alexander Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Financial Group LLC
Represented By: Tony Alexander Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian Ponceliz
Represented By: Tony Alexander Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?