Moncada v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Moncada
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61058
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Anderson, Tiffany)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #6 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #12 Order (Verified Certificate Regarding Prior ADA Cases) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a verifiedcertificate in accordance with DE #6 by June 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/19/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/3/2019. (jrf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Anderson, Tiffany)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Anderson, Tiffany)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint and to File a Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. Attorney Tiffany Lynn Anderson added to party Ruby Tuesday, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Tiffany)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT, ( Responses due by 5/28/2019) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Daniel Moncada. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Hannah, Roderick)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (vmz)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11591078, filed by Daniel Moncada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncada v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Lynn Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Moncada
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?